Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:Emily C Marks
Case #: 1:25-cv-00105
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 4:34 AM CDT
Appellant
RE 1EMI, LLC
Represented By
Richard Scott Williams
Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell
contact info
Appellee
Bankruptcy Administrator
U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator One Church Street
Montgomery, AL 36104
Represented By
Britt Batson Griggs
U. S. Bankruptcy Administrator
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
6 6 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/17 3:06 PM
PURSUANT TO REASSIGNMENT ORDER ENTERED IN LEAD CASE AT DE 6 - Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as Presiding Judge. Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (BES)
Related: [-]
5 5 4 pgs order Order Mon 03/17 2:31 PM
ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) Case No. 1:25-cv-90-RAH, Case No. 1:25-cv-92-RAH, Case No. 1:25-cv-94-RAH, Case No. 1:25-cv-96-RAH, Case No. 1:25-cv-99-RAH, Case No. 1:25-cv-101-RAH, Case No. 1:25-cv-103-RAH, Case No. 1:25-cv-105-RAH, and Case No. Case No. 1:25-cv-107-RAH be and are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all further proceedings, with Case No. 1:25-cv-90-RAH being the LEAD CASE; and 2) All pleadings, motion, briefs, order, and other documents submitted in the consolidated cases shall henceforth be filed only in Case No. 1:25-cv-90-RAH, unless ordered otherwise; and, 3) The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to file a copy of this order in all nine consolidated cases. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 3/17/2025. (BES)
Related: [-]
utility Create Case Association Mon 03/17 2:48 PM
Member case associated; Lead case designated as 1:25-cv-90-RAH. (BES)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
4 4 respoth Response in Support Fri 03/14 11:15 AM
RESPONSE in Support re3 Order to Show Cause, by RE 1EMI, LLC. (Williams, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 03/10 9:55 AM
ORDERED that on or before March 14, 2025, the parties shall show cause why these cases should not be consolidated for purposes of these appeals including all further briefing and disposition. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 3/10/2025. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
2 2 appeal Bankruptcy Designation of Record Fri 03/07 3:51 PM
Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of Appellant's & Appellee's Designations of Record on appeal, which was filed with the US Bankruptcy Court.(BES) (BES). (BES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appellant's Designation - DE 1 - Petition,
Att: 2 Appellant's Designation - De 10 - Appellant Designation of Record,
Att: 3 Appellant's Designation - De 12 - Motion for Authority,
Att: 4 Appellant's Designation - DE 16 - Corporate Resolution,
Att: 5 Appellant's Designation - DE 49 - Transcript,
Att: 6 Appellant's Designation - DE 53 - Amended Response,
Att: 7 Appellant's Designation - DE 57 - EBCC Opposition,
Att: 8 Appellant's Designation - DE 68 - Order,
Att: 9 Appellant's Designation - DE 105 - Emergency Motion for Extension,
Att: 10 Appellant's Designation - DE 176 - Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 11 Appellant's Designation - DE 221 - Response,
Att: 12 Appellant's Designation - DE 222 - Response,
Att: 13 Appellant's Designation - DE 246 - Joint Stipulation,
Att: 14 Appellant's Designation - DE 248 - Joint Stipulation,
Att: 15 Appellant's Designation - DE 250 - Motion for Relief,
Att: 16 Appellant's Designation - DE 251 - Motion for Authority,
Att: 17 Appellant's Designation - DE 259 - Transcript,
Att: 18 Appellant's Designation - DE 261 - Brief,
Att: 19 Appellant's Designation - DE 262 - Brief,
Att: 20 Appellant's Designation - DE 266 - Agreed Motion to Supplement,
Att: 21 Appellant's Designation - DE 269 - Memorandum,
Att: 22 Appellant's Designation - DE 271 - Motion to Alter,
Att: 23 Appellant's Designation - DE 278 - Order,
Att: 24 Appellant's Designation - DE 280 - Notice of Appeal
Att: 25 (3/7/2025) Appellee's Designation - DE 11 - Appellee Designation,
Att: 26 (3/7/2025) Appellee's Designation - DE 13 - Motion Authorizing,
Att: 27 (3/7/2025) Appellee's Designation - DE 100 - Order,
Att: 28 (3/7/2025) Appellee's Designation - DE 106 - Order,
Att: 29 (3/7/2025) Appellee's Designation - DE 132 - Transcript,
Att: 30 (3/7/2025) Appellee's Designation - DE 137 - Supplemental Response,
Att: 31 (3/7/2025) Appellee's Designation - DE 139 - Order,
Att: 32 (3/7/2025) Appellee's Designation - DE 149 - Schedules,
Att: 33 (3/7/2025) Appellee's Designation - DE 150 - Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs,
Att: 34 (3/7/2025) Appellee's Designation - DE 157 - Amended Schedules,
Att: 35 (3/7/2025) Appellee's Designation - DE 162 - Ch 11 Monthly Report May 2024,
Att: 36 (3/7/2025) Appellee's Designation - DE 163 - Ch 11 Monthly Report June 2024,
Att: 37 (3/7/2025) Appellee's Designation - DE 164 - Ch 11 Monthly Report July 2024,
Att: 38 (3/7/2025) Appellee's Designation - DE 167 - Motion to Extend,
Att: 39 (3/7/2025) Appellee's Designation - DE 172 - Response,
Att: 40 (3/7/2025) Appellee's Designation - DE 178 - Transcript,
Att: 41 (3/7/2025) Appellee's Designation - DE 182 - Declaration
Att: 42 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 1 - Complaint,
Att: 43 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 2 - Prelim. Injunction,
Att: 44 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 3 - Contempt Motion,
Att: 45 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 4 - Summary Judgment Motion,
Att: 46 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 5 - Transcript,
Att: 47 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 6 - Contempt Order,
Att: 48 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 7 - Second Contempt Motion,
Att: 49 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 8 - Ex B to Second Contempt Motion,
Att: 50 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 9 - Ex D to Second Contempt Motion,
Att: 51 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 10 - Transcript,
Att: 52 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 11 - Transcript,
Att: 53 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 12 - Willscher Affirmation,
Att: 54 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 13 - Ex A to Willscher Affirmation,
Att: 55 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 14 - Ex B to Willscher Affirmation,
Att: 56 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 15 - Ex C to Willscher Affirmation,
Att: 57 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 16 - Ex D to Willscher Affirmation,
Att: 58 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 17 - Ex E to Willscher Affirmation,
Att: 59 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 18 - Ex F to Willscher Affirmation,
Att: 60 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 19 - Ex G to Willscher Affirmation,
Att: 61 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 20 - Ex H to Willscher Affirmation,
Att: 62 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 21 - Ex J to Willscher Affirmation,
Att: 63 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 22 - Transcript,
Att: 64 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 23 - Order,
Att: 65 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 24 - CR Complaint,
Att: 66 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 25 - Indictment,
Att: 67 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 26 - Post Indictment Restraining Order,
Att: 68 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 27 - Superseding Indictment,
Att: 69 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 28 - Ex O to Parks Declaration,
Att: 70 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 29 - Letter to Court,
Att: 71 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 30 - Collins Affidavit,
Att: 72 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 31 - Order to Show Cause,
Att: 73 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 32 - Order to Show Cause,
Att: 74 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 36 - EBCC Proof of Claim,
Att: 75 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 83 - Transcript,
Att: 76 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 84 - Transcript,
Att: 77 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 85 - Transcript,
Att: 78 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 86 - Transcript,
Att: 79 (3/7/2025) CR Emigrant - Ex 87 - DOJ Proof of Claim,
Att: 80 (3/7/2025) DE 12 - Appellee Designation,
Att: 81 (3/7/2025) Docket Sheet
Thursday, February 06, 2025
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Tue 02/11 8:49 AM
Bankruptcy Clerk's TRANSMITTAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT; Bankruptcy Court case number 24-10513 (BES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Appeal,
Att: 2 DE 278 - Order,
Att: 3 USBC Certified Docket Sheet