Texas Western District Court
Judge:Fred Biery
Referred: Henry J Bemporad
Case #: 5:25-cv-00146
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Foreclosure
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Case in other court:150th District Court of Bexar County, Texas, 2025CI00247
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 6:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Bank Of America, N.A.
Represented By
Robert Davis Forster, II
Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner And Engel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gabriella Rodriguez-Sanchez
5619 Spring Moon St.
San Antonio, TX 78247


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/15 9:34 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Bank Of America, N.A., re10 MOTION filed by Plaintiff Gabriella Rodriguez-Sanchez(Pietrzak, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Ryan Bourgois
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/01 11:29 AM
ORDER --In accordance with the Court's rulings at the Initial Pretrial Conference, it is hereby ORDERED as follows, Defendant must respond to Plaintiffs Application for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order (Docket Entry 10) on or before May 15, 2025. Plaintiff must respond to Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry 6) on or before May 30, 2025. Plaintiff must make initial disclosures as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(l) on or before May 30, 2025.. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (vl)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 05/01 11:17 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry J. Bemporad: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/30/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Zoom.)(vl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
17 17 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 04/29 8:25 AM
Scheduling Recommendations by Gabriella Rodriguez-Sanchez. (vl)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Tue 04/29 8:22 AM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report by Gabriella Rodriguez-Sanchez. (vl)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 04/29 8:20 AM
Scheduling Recommendations by Gabriella Rodriguez-Sanchez. (vl)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 04/28 4:01 PM
Scheduling Recommendations by Bank Of America, N.A.. (Pietrzak, Kyle)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Mon 04/28 4:01 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Bank Of America, N.A.. (Pietrzak, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 04/07 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle E. Pietrzak on behalf of Bank Of America, N.A.. Attorney Kyle E. Pietrzak added to party Bank Of America, N.A.(pty:dft) (Pietrzak, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 03/27 2:10 PM
ORDER DENYING9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
10 10 notice Notice Wed 03/26 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Emergency Petition for Temporary Restraining Order filed in Bexar County by Gabriella Rodriguez-Sanchez (bt)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 03/26 11:30 AM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gabriella Rodriguez-Sanchez.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Order on Motion for TRO Tue 03/18 3:45 PM
ORDER GRANTING7 Motion to Continue( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2025 2:30 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,); STRIKING7 Motion for TRO Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (vl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
7 7 motion Continue Temporary Restraining Order Mon 03/17 2:47 PM
MOTION to Continue and MOTION for Emergency Petition and Application for Temporary Restraining Order by Gabriella Rodriguez-Sanchez.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (vl)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 03/14 11:09 AM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bank Of America, N.A... Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Forster, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Granting Defendant BANA's Motion to Dismiss
Thursday, February 20, 2025
5 5 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 02/21 2:06 PM
ORDER SETTING VIDEO INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, (Video Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2025 2:30 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 02/19 9:59 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (vl)
Related: [-]
3 3 5 pgs order Order Wed 02/19 8:59 AM
STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (vl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Wed 02/12 12:06 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties and Disclosure Statement by Bank of America. (Forster, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 02/12 11:56 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-19783218), filed by Bank of America.(Forster, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B,
Att: 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C,
Att: 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D,
Att: 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/18 4:46 PM
Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bt)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Tue 02/18 4:46 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bt)
Related: [-]