California Northern District Court
Judge:Beth Labson Freeman
Referred: Virginia K Demarchi
Case #: 5:25-cv-01436
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 3:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Lavender Lingerie, LLC
Plaintiff
Jayden Sanders
Represented By
Gerald D Lane, Jr
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Mon 05/05 9:29 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM WEBINAR CONFERENCE and NOTICE OF REQUIRED REGISTRATION. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2025 11:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 5/13/2025, at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery Sealed Document - No NEF Thu 04/03 2:17 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for Discovery. (tsh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 02/12 11:54 AM
Summons Issued as to Lavender Lingerie, LLC. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 02/12 11:53 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2025 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only.(far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 02/12 11:22 AM
Case assigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (pjf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Wed 02/12 10:40 AM
Proposed Summons. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 02/12 10:39 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jayden Sanders.. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 02/12 10:38 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Jayden Sanders (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/12 10:31 AM
COMPLAINT against Lavender Lingerie, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20340974.). Filed by Jayden Sanders.(Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet