Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Tilman E Self, III
Case #: 5:25-cv-00052
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1346 Wrongful Death
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of Bibb County, 2025-CV-082207
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 5:12 AM EDT
Defendant
CORRECTHEALTH BIBB LLC
Represented By
CHELSEA N MURPHY
contact info
Defendant
SHERIFF DAVID DAVIS
Represented By
SPENCER WOODY
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-5
Defendant
HAROLD FRANKLIN
Represented By
SPENCER WOODY
contact info
Defendant
BRANNON GRACE
Represented By
SPENCER WOODY
contact info
Defendant
JORGE MORERA
Represented By
SPENCER WOODY
contact info
Defendant
KENDRA ORANGE
Represented By
CHELSEA N MURPHY
contact info
Defendant
DEPUTY MICHAEL RHODES
Represented By
SPENCER WOODY
contact info
Defendant
TERRALYN TAYLOR
Represented By
SPENCER WOODY
contact info
Defendant
ERIC WOODFORD
Represented By
SPENCER WOODY
contact info
Plaintiff
MARLENA HENDERSON
Represented By
MICHAEL HILL
contact info
SEAN T MIMS
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 04/28 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by SHEPARD SMITH on behalf of DAVID DAVIS, HAROLD FRANKLIN, BRANNON GRACE, MICHAEL RHODES, ERIC WOODFORD Attorney SHEPARD SMITH added to party DAVID DAVIS(pty:dft), Attorney SHEPARD SMITH added to party HAROLD FRANKLIN(pty:dft), Attorney SHEPARD SMITH added to party BRANNON GRACE(pty:dft), Attorney SHEPARD SMITH added to party MICHAEL RHODES(pty:dft), Attorney SHEPARD SMITH added to party ERIC WOODFORD(pty:dft)(SMITH, SHEPARD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
29 29 5 pgs order Order - Rules 16/26 Mon 04/21 11:14 AM
RULES 16/26 ORDER :Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 5/22/2025. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 4/21/2025.(vs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Required Form
Friday, April 18, 2025
28 28 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/18 3:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by KENDRA ORANGE, CORRECTHEALTH BIBB LLC identifying Corporate Parent CORRECTHEALTH, LLC, Corporate Parent TRIAGE HOLDINGS, LLC for CORRECTHEALTH BIBB LLC. (MURPHY, CHELSEA)
Related: [-]
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/18 3:37 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, by KENDRA ORANGE with Jury Demand.(MURPHY, CHELSEA)
Related: [-]
26 26 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/18 3:36 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, by CORRECTHEALTH BIBB LLC with Jury Demand.(MURPHY, CHELSEA)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 04/18 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by DUKE R GROOVER on behalf of DAVID DAVIS, HAROLD FRANKLIN, BRANNON GRACE, MICHAEL RHODES, ERIC WOODFORD Attorney DUKE R GROOVER added to party DAVID DAVIS(pty:dft), Attorney DUKE R GROOVER added to party HAROLD FRANKLIN(pty:dft), Attorney DUKE R GROOVER added to party BRANNON GRACE(pty:dft), Attorney DUKE R GROOVER added to party MICHAEL RHODES(pty:dft), Attorney DUKE R GROOVER added to party ERIC WOODFORD(pty:dft)(GROOVER, DUKE)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 04/18 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LAUREN N SCHULTZ on behalf of DAVID DAVIS, HAROLD FRANKLIN, BRANNON GRACE, MICHAEL RHODES, ERIC WOODFORD Attorney LAUREN N SCHULTZ added to party DAVID DAVIS(pty:dft), Attorney LAUREN N SCHULTZ added to party HAROLD FRANKLIN(pty:dft), Attorney LAUREN N SCHULTZ added to party BRANNON GRACE(pty:dft), Attorney LAUREN N SCHULTZ added to party MICHAEL RHODES(pty:dft), Attorney LAUREN N SCHULTZ added to party ERIC WOODFORD(pty:dft)(SCHULTZ, LAUREN)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 04/18 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CHELSEA N MURPHY on behalf of KENDRA ORANGE, CORRECTHEALTH BIBB LLC (MURPHY, CHELSEA)
Related: [-]
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/18 3:19 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, by ERIC WOODFORD with Jury Demand.(WOODY, SPENCER)
Related: [-]
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/18 3:18 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, by MICHAEL RHODES with Jury Demand.(WOODY, SPENCER)
Related: [-]
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/18 3:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, by BRANNON GRACE with Jury Demand.(WOODY, SPENCER)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/18 3:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, by HAROLD FRANKLIN with Jury Demand.(WOODY, SPENCER)
Related: [-]
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/18 3:13 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, by DAVID DAVIS with Jury Demand.(WOODY, SPENCER)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 04/18 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by THOMAS E LAVENDER, III on behalf of KENDRA ORANGE, CORRECTHEALTH BIBB LLC Attorney THOMAS E LAVENDER, III added to party CORRECTHEALTH BIBB LLC(pty:dft)(LAVENDER, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/18 12:06 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, by TERRALYN TAYLOR with Jury Demand.(ADAMS, CHARLES)Attorney CHARLES R ADAMS, III added to party KENDRA ORANGE(pty:dft) Modified on 4/18/2025 to add NOD Notice of Deficiency - Wrong filer selected at the time of filing. DO NOT RE-FILE, corrected by case manager (esl)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/18 11:59 AM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, by JORGE MORERA with Jury Demand.(ADAMS, CHARLES)Attorney CHARLES R ADAMS, III added to party JORGE MORERA(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 03/13 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by SEAN T MIMS on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney SEAN T MIMS added to party MARLENA HENDERSON(pty:pla)(MIMS, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
13 13 order Order Tue 03/04 9:49 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER . The Court VACATES its2 Rules 16/26 Order. The Court will re-issue the 16/26 Order once Defendants file a responsive pleading. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 03/04/2025. (cmh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/27 12:33 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARLENA HENDERSON as to DAVID DAVIS. (HILL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/27 12:33 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARLENA HENDERSON as to BRANNON GRACE. (HILL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/27 12:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARLENA HENDERSON as to MICHAEL RHODES. (HILL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/27 12:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARLENA HENDERSON as to ERIC WOODFORD. (HILL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/27 12:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARLENA HENDERSON as to HAROLD FRANKLIN. (HILL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/27 12:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARLENA HENDERSON as to JORGE MORERA. (HILL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/27 12:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARLENA HENDERSON as to TERRALYN TAYLOR. (HILL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/27 12:05 PM
*** DISREGARD- FILED IN ERROR *** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID DAVIS as to DAVID DAVIS. (WOODY, SPENCER) Modified on 2/27/2025 TO ADD DISREGARD NOTICE PER PHONE CALL FROM FILER (elp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 02/19 3:50 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CORRECTHEALTH BIBB LLC as to CORRECTHEALTH BIBB LLC. (MURPHY, CHELSEA)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 02/19 3:48 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KENDRA ORANGE as to KENDRA ORANGE. (MURPHY, CHELSEA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
2 2 5 pgs order Order - Rules 16/26 Thu 02/13 11:04 AM
RULES 16/26 ORDER :Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 3/17/2025. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 2/13/2025.(vs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Required Form
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 02/12 1:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL against MARLENA HENDERSON Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4867155, $405 filed by All Defendants All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case. (WOODY, SPENCER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Case filing Form,
Att: 2 Summons Summons Harold Franklin,
Att: 3 Summons Summons Brannon Grace,
Att: 4 Summons Summons Michael Rhodes,
Att: 5 Summons Summons Eric Woodford,
Att: 6 Summons Summons Terralyn Taylor,
Att: 7 Summons Summons CorrectHealth,
Att: 8 Summons Summons David Davis,
Att: 9 Summons Summons Kendra Orange,
Att: 10 Removal Documents Complaint