Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Katherine A Robertson
Case #: 3:25-cv-30026
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Case in other court:Hampden Superior Court, 2579cv00054
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 7:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Dorothy Jenkins
Represented By
David S. Lawless
Robinson Donovan, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Monson Board of Health
Represented By
David S. Lawless
Robinson Donovan, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
John Morrell
Represented By
David S. Lawless
Robinson Donovan, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Patricia Oney
Represented By
David S. Lawless
Robinson Donovan, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Sherri Roberson
Represented By
David S. Lawless
Robinson Donovan, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Town of Monson
Represented By
David S. Lawless
Robinson Donovan, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Peter Warren
Represented By
David S. Lawless
Robinson Donovan, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Frederick Giuliani
Represented By
Edward M. Pikula
Attorney Edward M. Pikula
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
16 16 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/09 8:26 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: Scheduling Conference held on 5/8/2025. Attorneys Present (by Video): Edward M. Pikula and David S. Lawless. Colloquy re: status of the case. A schedule was established as follows: Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) initial disclosures to be completed by 5/29/2025 ; Motions for leave to amend pleadings to add claims/parties shall be filed by 7/8/2025 ; Non-expert discovery, including service of and responses to all written discovery (including requests for admissions) and non-expert depositions to be completed by 11/14/2025 ; and A Case Management Conference is set for 11/18/2025 at 3:00 PM in Franklin Courtroom (In person unless counsel move for leave to appear remotely) before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. No further deadlines set. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/Audio.html. For a transcript of this proceeding, contact mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov.) (MMR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
15 15 misc Joint statement re scheduling conference Tue 05/06 5:00 PM
JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Lawless, David)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Rescheduling Tue 05/06 2:01 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing and Rescheduling ISSUED: In light of the consent form filed by the parties (Dkt. No. 12 ), the Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2025 before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni is hereby VACATED. The Scheduling Conference is reset to 5/8/2025 at 10:30 AM in Franklin Courtroom (In person with remote access provided to counsel of record) before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (PLEASE NOTE CHANGE AS TO THE PRESIDING JUDGE AND TIME.) The video conference information will be emailed to counsel of record by the clerk. (MMR)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Reassignment Tue 05/06 1:44 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson added. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni no longer assigned to case. (MPZ)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 05/06 1:22 PM
CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MMR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
11 11 discov Joint submission pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Wed 04/23 10:31 AM
JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Frederick Giuliani.(Pikula, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit signed consent to assignment to Magistrate Judge Robertson
Friday, April 04, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Fri 04/04 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2025 at 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Springfield before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni. See attached notice for complete details. (TRL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/20 3:34 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Town of Monson, Sherri Roberson, Dorothy Jenkins, Monson Board of Health, John Morrell, Peter Warren, Patricia Oney.(Lawless, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
8 8 misc State Court Record - no answer filed in state court Fri 02/21 3:19 PM
STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Lawless, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 02/14 3:49 PM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/21/25 to respond to plaintiff's complaint by TOWN OF MONSON, SHERRI ROBERSON, DOROTHY JENKINS, MONSON BOARD OF HEALTH, JOHN MORRELL, PETER WARREN, PATRICIA ONEY. (TRL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
6 6 motion Extension of Time Thu 02/13 4:26 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/21/25 to respond to plaintiff's complaint by TOWN OF MONSON, SHERRI ROBERSON, DOROTHY JENKINS, MONSON BOARD OF HEALTH, JOHN MORRELL, PETER WARREN, PATRICIA ONEY.(Lawless, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Thu 02/13 8:44 AM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. Counsel who filed an appearance in this case prior to its removal must refer to[LINK:Local Rule 83.5.3(f)] Practice by Persons Not Members of the Bar on how to proceed as an attorney in this court. General Information for Attorneys can be found[LINK:here] . (MPZ)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Case Assignment Thu 02/13 8:39 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (MPZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/12 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward M. Pikula on behalf of FREDERICK GIULIANI (Pikula, Edward)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/12 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Lawless on behalf of TOWN OF MONSON, SHERRI ROBERSON, DOROTHY JENKINS, MONSON BOARD OF HEALTH, JOHN MORRELL, PETER WARREN, PATRICIA ONEY (Lawless, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 02/12 1:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TOWN OF MONSON, SHERRI ROBERSON, DOROTHY JENKINS, MONSON BOARD OF HEALTH, JOHN MORRELL, PETER WARREN, PATRICIA ONEY ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10837413 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Lawless, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Category Form,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet