Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 15
Judge:Scott M Grossman
Case #: 0:25-bk-11421
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025

Debtor
Rontan Eletro Metalurgica Ltda.; and Rontan Telecom Comercio De Telecomunicacoes Ltda.
Nyana A. Miller Sequor Law 1111 Brickell Avenue Suite 1250
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Nyana A Miller
Sequor Law P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
Foreign Representative
Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda
Nyana A. Miller Sequor Law 1111 Brickell Avenue Suite 1250
Miami, FL 33133
Represented By
Nyana A Miller
Sequor Law P.A.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 23, 2025
46 46 ordertext Order Granting (TEXT ONLY) Fri 05/23 9:54 AM
Order Granting 45 Ex Parte Motion For Leave To Appear Remotely on 5/28/2025 at 01:30 Related [+]] filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. ***Counsel Halperin's motion to appear remotely at the May 28, 2025 hearing in this case is GRANTED .*** SO ORDERED by Judge Scott M Grossman . (**This is a text-only order with no underlying PDF image entered pursuant to Local Rule 5005-4(F) and Local Rule 9021-1(A)**). (Garciga, Katelyn)
Related: [-] 42 Motion for Protective Order, 43 Notice of Hearing
Thursday, May 22, 2025
45 45 motion Appear Remotely (Ex Parte) Thu 05/22 3:12 PM
Ex Parte Motion For Leave To Appear Remotely on 5/28/2025 at 01:30 Related [+]] Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda (Halperin, Daniel)
Related: [-] 42 Motion for Protective Order,43 Notice of Hearing
44 44 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Thu 05/22 11:03 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Nyana A Miller Related [+]. (Miller, Nyana)
Related: [-] 43 Notice of Hearing
Monday, May 19, 2025
43 43 court Notice of Hearing (BK) Mon 05/19 3:33 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2025 at 01:30 PM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 308 (SMG), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Gomez, Edy)
Related: [-] 42 Ex Parte Motion for Protective Order and for Entry of Stipulation of Confidentiality Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda
Friday, May 16, 2025
42 42 motion Protective Order Fri 05/16 4:49 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Protective Order and for Entry of Stipulation of Confidentiality Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda (Miller, Nyana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Exhibit 1
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
41 41 notice Notice of Examination Wed 04/16 4:59 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Rev Group International, Inc. on Friday, May 9, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
40 40 notice Notice of Examination Tue 04/15 4:55 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of US Tax Consulting, Inc. on May 15, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
39 39 notice Notice of Examination Tue 04/15 4:54 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Sueli Da Rocha on May 15, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
38 38 notice Notice of Examination Tue 04/15 4:53 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of A Registered Agent, Inc. on May 15, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Redact Order Tue 04/15 12:04 PM
Order Granting Ex Parte Motion to Redact Information Related [+] (Wilson, Melissa)
Related: [-] 36
Thursday, April 10, 2025
36 36 motion Redact Thu 04/10 2:37 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Redact Document ECF No. 35-1 Fee Amount $28 This Document Will NOT be Available for Public Viewing, Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda (Miller, Nyana)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 04/10 2:37 PM
Receipt of Motion to Redact([LINK 25-11421 SMG] ) [motion,mredact] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A45872847. Fee amount 28.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
35 35 notice Notice of Examination Wed 04/09 1:07 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Rev Group International, Inc. on Friday, May 9, 2025 at 10:00 am Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, April 04, 2025
34 34 notice Notice of Examination Fri 04/04 11:13 AM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of UBS AG, Stamford Branch on April 30, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Examination Fri 04/04 11:12 AM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Standard Chartered Bank PLC on April 30, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Examination Fri 04/04 11:11 AM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Santander Bank N.A., on April 30, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Examination Fri 04/04 11:10 AM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Commerzbank A.G. on April 30, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Examination Fri 04/04 11:09 AM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Bank of America, N.A. on April 30, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Examination Fri 04/04 11:08 AM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Banco Itau on April 30, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Examination Fri 04/04 11:07 AM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Banco Do Brasil, S.A. on April 30, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Examination Fri 04/04 11:06 AM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Banco Bradesco on April 30, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Examination Tue 04/01 11:33 AM
Amended Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC on April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
25 25 utility Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF] Tue 04/01 8:25 AM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect Case Number Indicated on PDF Image. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO FILE AN AMENDED **DOCUMENT** WITHIN TWO BUSINESS DAYS. Related [+] (Wilson, Melissa)
Related: [-] 17 Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC on April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda.
Monday, March 31, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Examination Mon 03/31 3:57 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Examination Mon 03/31 3:56 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of The Bank of New York Mellon on April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Examination Mon 03/31 3:55 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Societe Generale on April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Examination Mon 03/31 3:54 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. on April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Examination Mon 03/31 3:53 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of HSBC Bank USA, N.A. on April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Examination Mon 03/31 3:53 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas on April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Examination Mon 03/31 3:52 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Citibank, N.A. on April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Examination Mon 03/31 3:51 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of The Clearing House Payments Company, LLC on April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Examination Mon 03/31 3:50 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Capital One N.A. on April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Examination Mon 03/31 3:49 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of BNP Paribas USA on April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Examination Mon 03/31 3:48 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Barclays Bank PLC on April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Examination Mon 03/31 3:47 PM
Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of Bank of Nova Scotia on April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Timothy, Templeton)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
12 12 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Thu 03/13 11:07 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Nyana A Miller Related [+]. (Miller, Nyana)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Miscellaneous Motion
11 11 order Miscellaneous Motion Order Thu 03/13 10:13 AM
Order Granting Motion Recognition of Chapter 15 Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda Related [+] (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-] # 2
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
10 10 ordertext Order Granting (TEXT ONLY) Tue 03/11 4:59 PM
Order Granting 9 Ex Parte Motion For Leave To Appear Remotely on 3/12/2025 at 02:00 Related [+]] filed by Creditor Global Digital Solutions, Inc.. ***Counsel Vicens Beard's motion to appear remotely at the March 12, 2025 hearing in this case is GRANTED .*** SO ORDERED by Judge Scott M Grossman . (**This is a text-only order with no underlying PDF image entered pursuant to Local Rule 5005-4(F) and Local Rule 9021-1(A)**). (Garciga, Katelyn)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Hearing
9 9 motion Appear Remotely (Ex Parte) Tue 03/11 4:45 PM
Ex Parte Motion For Leave To Appear Remotely on 3/12/2025 at 02:00 Related [+]] Filed by Creditor Global Digital Solutions, Inc. (Vicens Beard, Cristina)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Hearing
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Tue 03/11 4:39 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Cristina Vicens Beard Filed by Creditor Global Digital Solutions, Inc.. (Vicens Beard, Cristina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
7 7 ordertext Order Granting (TEXT ONLY) Tue 02/18 2:11 PM
Order Granting 6 Motion EXPARTE MOTION SEEKING PERMISSION AND AUTHORIZATION FOR PARTIES TO ATTEND THE RECOGNITION HEARING ON ZOOM filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. ***Counsel Miller's motion to allow Ana Cristina Baptista Campi and Brazilian counsel appear remotely at the March 12, 2025 hearing in this case is GRANTED .*** SO ORDERED by Judge Scott M Grossman . (**This is a text-only order with no underlying PDF image entered pursuant to Local Rule 5005-4(F) and Local Rule 9021-1(A)**). (Garciga, Katelyn)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Motion Tue 02/18 11:13 AM
Motion EXPARTE MOTION SEEKING PERMISSION AND AUTHORIZATION FOR PARTIES TO ATTEND THE RECOGNITION HEARING ON ZOOM Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda (Miller, Nyana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
5 5 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Thu 02/13 4:38 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Nyana A Miller Related [+]. (Miller, Nyana)
Related: [-] 1 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding filed by Debtor Rontan Eletro Metalurgica Ltda.; and Rontan Telecom Comercio De Telecomunicacoes Ltda.,2 Motion Recognition of Chapter 15 filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda,3 Corporate Ownership Statement filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda,4 Notice of Hearing
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
4 4 court Notice of Hearing (BK) Wed 02/12 1:50 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/12/2025 at 02:00 PM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 308 (SMG), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Gomez, Edy)
Related: [-] 2 Motion Recognition of Chapter 15 Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
3 3 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 02/11 11:17 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda. (Miller, Nyana)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Motion Tue 02/11 11:16 AM
Motion Recognition of Chapter 15 Filed by Foreign Representative Campi Servicos Empresariais Ltda (Miller, Nyana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration Chapter 15 Application
Att: 2 Proposed Order Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order
1 1 4 pgs misc Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding Tue 02/11 10:31 AM
Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding. Chapter 15 List per BR 1007 due 02/25/2025. (Miller, Nyana)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 02/11 10:33 AM
Receipt of Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding([LINK 25-11421 ) [misc,petfp15] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A45571945. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]