Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Case #: 2:25-ap-02004
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Terminated:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Texas Solar Integrated, LLC
3511 Broadway St.
San Antonio, TX 78209
Represented By
Texas Solar Integrated, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Michael R. Sardo
112 E. Pecan St., Suite 1650
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
Michael R. Sardo
contact info
Plaintiff
Green Lease Co., LLC
c//o Denny Barre Gaslight Square 1001 Third St., Suite No. 1
Corpus Christi, TX 78404
Represented By
Green Lease Co., LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Williard Hammons II
c//o Denny Barre Gaslight Square 1001 Third St., Suite No. 1
Corpus Christi, TX 78404
Represented By
Williard Hammons II
contact info
Plaintiff
Williard WH TSI Holdings, LLC
c//o Denny Barre Gaslight Square 1001 Third St., Suite No. 1
Corpus Christi, TX 78404
Represented By
Williard WH TSI Holdings, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CM TSI Holdings, LLC
c//o Denny Barre Gaslight Square 1001 Third St., Suite No. 1
Corpus Christi, TX 78404
Represented By
CM TSI Holdings, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Solar Green Co. No. 1, LLC
c//o Denny Barre Gaslight Square 1001 Third St., Suite No. 1
Corpus Christi, TX 78404
Represented By
Solar Green Co. No. 1, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Solar Green Co. No. 2, LLC
c//o Denny Barre Gaslight Square 1001 Third St., Suite No. 1
Corpus Christi, TX 78404
Represented By
Solar Green Co. No. 2, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Solar Green Co. No. 3, LLC
c//o Denny Barre Gaslight Square 1001 Third St., Suite No. 1
Corpus Christi, TX 78404
Represented By
Solar Green Co. No. 3, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
WH&CM Holdings, LLC
c//o Denny Barre Gaslight Square 1001 Third St., Suite No. 1
Corpus Christi, TX 78404
Represented By
WH&CM Holdings, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/02 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 04/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion To Transfer Adversary
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/01 12:12 PM
Adversary Case 2:25-ap-2004 Closed. Case transferred out of district. (acj4)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order to Transfer Adversary Case Mon 03/31 5:16 PM
Order Transferring Venue Related [+] Case Number: 2502004, Signed on 3/31/2025. (acj4)
Related: [-] 11
Friday, March 28, 2025
12 12 notice Notice Fri 03/28 4:59 PM
Notice of No Opposition to Texas Solar Integrated, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue of Adversary Proceeding . Filed by CM TSI Holdings, LLC, Green Lease Co., LLC, Solar Green Co. No. 1, LLC, Solar Green Co. No. 2, LLC, Solar Green Co. No. 3, LLC, Williard WH TSI Holdings, LLC, WH&CM Holdings, LLC (Alaniz, Omar)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
11 11 motion Transfer Adversary Fri 03/07 2:16 PM
Motion to Transfer Adversary To Another District. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Texas Solar Integrated, LLC (Kingman, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 02/26 8:35 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Thomas A Howley Filed by on behalf of Michael R. Sardo (Howley, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
9 9 notice Notice Tue 02/25 4:06 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice . Filed by Michael R. Sardo (Cano, Emma)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Statement Tue 02/25 12:51 PM
Statement of Plaintiffs Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9027(e)(3) (Filed By CM TSI Holdings, LLC, Green Lease Co., LLC, Solar Green Co. No. 1, LLC, Solar Green Co. No. 2, LLC, Solar Green Co. No. 3, LLC, Williard WH TSI Holdings, LLC, WH&CM Holdings, LLC ). (Alaniz, Omar)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
7 7 misc Certificate Fri 02/21 1:36 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Green Lease Co. No. 2, LLC, Green Lease Co., LLC, Solar Green Co. No. 1, LLC, Solar Green Co. No. 2, LLC, Solar Green Co. No. 3, LLC, WH&CM Holdings, LLC ) Related [+] (Alaniz, Omar)
Related: [-] 4 Order for Conference
Thursday, February 20, 2025
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/20 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 02/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order for Conference
5 5 notice Notice Thu 02/20 4:03 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of All Papers . Filed by Green Lease Co. No. 2, LLC, CM TSI Holdings, LLC, Green Lease Co., LLC, Williard Hammons II, Solar Green Co. No. 1, LLC, Solar Green Co. No. 2, LLC, Solar Green Co. No. 3, LLC, Williard WH TSI Holdings, LLC, WH&CM Holdings, LLC (Barre, Denny)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Tue 02/18 9:50 AM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/16/2025 at 10:30 AM at telephone and video conference. (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 02/17 2:23 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Omar Jesus Alaniz Filed by on behalf of Green Lease Co., LLC, Solar Green Co. No. 1, LLC, Solar Green Co. No. 2, LLC, Solar Green Co. No. 3, LLC, WH&CM Holdings, LLC (Alaniz, Omar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
2 2 notice Notice Thu 02/13 12:25 PM
Notice of Attorney Appearance . Filed by Williard Hammons II (Holzer, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Tue 02/11 4:12 PM
Nature of Suit: (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) Complaint by Green Lease Co., LLC, Williard Hammons II, Williard WH TSI Holdings, LLC, CM TSI Holdings, LLC, Solar Green Co. No. 1, LLC, Solar Green Co. No. 2, LLC, Solar Green Co. No. 3, LLC, WH&CM Holdings, LLC against Texas Solar Integrated, LLC, Michael R. Sardo. Fee Amount $350 (Kingman, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Exhibit
Att: 6 Exhibit
Att: 7 Exhibit
Att: 8 Exhibit
Att: 9 Exhibit
Att: 10 Exhibit
Att: 11 Exhibit
Att: 12 Exhibit
Att: 13 Exhibit
Att: 14 Exhibit
Att: 15 Exhibit
Att: 16 Exhibit
Att: 17 Exhibit
Att: 18 Exhibit
Att: 19 Exhibit
Att: 20 Exhibit
Att: 21 Exhibit
Att: 22 Exhibit