Kansas District Court
Judge:Daniel D Crabtree
Referred: Angel D Mitchell
Case #: 2:25-cv-02073
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 6:34 AM CDT
Defendant
Colorado Bureau of Investigation
Director, CBI 690 Kipling St Suite 3000
Lakewood, CO 80215
Represented By
Robin Koogler
Hall & Evans, Llc - Kc
contact info
Defendant
Federal Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Associate Chief Counsel Office of Chief Counsel 99 New York Ave. NE
Washington, DC 20226
Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation
Defendant
United States of America
Plaintiff
Dominic John Anthony
Represented By
Richard W. Martin
Martin Law Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
20 20 motion Extension of Time Tue 05/06 3:42 PM
Unopposed MOTION for extension of time of all Pending Deadlines by Defendants Federal Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States of America Related [+] (Koehler, Audrey)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
19 19 order Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling Tue 04/29 4:49 PM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 6/12/2025 at 10:30 AM by Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 913-423-1010 ACCESS CODE 172 480 243 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 5/23/2025. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 6/2/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 6/2/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on April 29, 2025. (mls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/23 11:47 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Colorado Bureau of Investigation.(Short, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
17 17 order Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer Tue 04/22 4:06 PM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/9/2025 for Defendants Federal Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States of America to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/22/2025. (jsh)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 2:02 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew D. Ringel for Colorado Bureau of Investigation pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/22/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 1:07 PM
MOTION for attorney Andrew D. Ringel to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6637564.) by Defendant Colorado Bureau of Investigation Related [+](Short, Meredith)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 ECF Registration Form
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/09 10:42 AM
ORDER granting13 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant Colorado Bureau of Investigation must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by April 23, 2025 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/9/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/08 5:28 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Colorado Bureau of Investigation Related [+] (Short, Meredith)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
12 12 misc Entry of Appearance Tue 04/08 5:26 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Meredith Jane Short on behalf of Colorado Bureau of Investigation. (Short, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/20 2:54 PM
ORDER granting9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant Colorado Bureau of Investigation must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by April 9, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 3/20/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 03/20 12:03 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Robin Koogler on behalf of Colorado Bureau of Investigation. (Koogler, Robin)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/20 11:25 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Colorado Bureau of Investigation. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell.) (Koogler, Robin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
misc Notice of Docket Text Modification Tue 03/04 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk re 4 / 6 / 7 : The answer date for Defendants Federal Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, Federal Bureau of Investigation and United States of America is 4/25/2025 (60 days after service on the U.S. Attorney). (mam)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
8 8 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Fri 02/28 12:15 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Dominic John Anthony upon Colorado Bureau of Investigation served on 2/24/2025, answer due 3/17/2025 (Martin, Richard)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Fri 02/28 12:14 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Dominic John Anthony upon Federal Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives served on 2/24/2025, answer due 3/17/2025 (Martin, Richard)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Fri 02/28 12:13 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Dominic John Anthony upon Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 2/24/2025, answer due 3/17/2025 (Martin, Richard)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Fri 02/28 12:12 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Dominic John Anthony upon US Attorney General (Martin, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Fri 02/28 12:11 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Dominic John Anthony upon United States of America served on 2/24/2025, answer due 3/17/2025 (Martin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
3 3 misc Designation of Place of Trial Wed 02/12 1:49 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Dominic John Anthony - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Martin, Richard)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/12 1:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Dominic John Anthony. (Martin, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (attorney) Wed 02/12 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6583640.), filed by Dominic John Anthony.(Martin, Richard)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Wed 02/12 2:55 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at https://www.uscourts.gov/file/459/download (nac)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 02/12 3:10 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Colorado Bureau of Investigation, Federal Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a text only entry. There is no PDF associated with this entry) (nac)
Related: [-]