Maryland District Court
Judge:Lydia Kay Griggsby
Case #: 8:25-cv-00455
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Declaratory Judgemen
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Case in other court:Circuit Court for Montgomery County, C15CV24006832
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 6:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Volante International Limited
Represented By
Curtis H Booth
Booth Cropper & Marriner, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain Insurance Companies Subscribing to Policy Number B074021F3032
Represented By
Curtis H Booth
Booth Cropper & Marriner, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Lloyd's Underwriter Syndicate Number 1274 AUL
Represented By
Curtis H Booth
Booth Cropper & Marriner, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Hunter Warfield, Inc
7600 Wisconsin Ave #700
Bethesda, MD 20814
Represented By
Stuart A Berman
Lerch Early & Brewer LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 23, 2025
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/23 10:03 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting20 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 5/23/2025. (mu1s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/21 11:37 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Their Reply In Support of Their Motion to Dismiss by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain Insurance Companies Subscribing to Policy Number B074021F3032, Lloyd's Underwriter Syndicate Number 1274 AUL, Volante International Limited(Dandelles, Stefan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 05/20 9:10 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer or Stay filed by Hunter Warfield, Inc.(Berman, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Michael Allweiss)
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/23 2:00 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting Plaintiff's17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to16 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay; modifying briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 4/23/2025. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/22 4:39 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer or Stay by Hunter Warfield, Inc.(Berman, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, April 21, 2025
16 16 motion Dismiss Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/21 3:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer or Stay by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain Insurance Companies Subscribing to Policy Number B074021F3032, Lloyd's Underwriter Syndicate Number 1274 AUL, Volante International Limited(Dandelles, Stefan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer or Stay,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Stefan R. Dandelles ISO Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
Friday, April 11, 2025
15 15 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/11 11:24 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stefan R. Dandelles. Directing attorney Stefan R. Dandelles to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/11/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/11 10:34 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brendan P. McGarry. Directing attorney Brendan P. McGarry to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/11/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
13 13 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/10 11:11 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stefan R. Dandelles (Filing fee $100, receipt number BMDDC-11902125.) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain Insurance Companies Subscribing to Policy Number B074021F3032, Lloyd's Underwriter Syndicate Number 1274 AUL, Volante International Limited(Booth, Curtis)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/10 11:09 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brendan P. McGarry (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11902104.) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain Insurance Companies Subscribing to Policy Number B074021F3032, Lloyd's Underwriter Syndicate Number 1274 AUL, Volante International Limited(Booth, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/07 11:21 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines for filing/briefing re: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, transfer venue. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 4/7/2025. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 23, 2025
10 10 corresp Miscellaneous Sun 02/23 3:20 PM
Correspondence re: Statement Under Standing Order Concerning Removal Actions (Booth, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/19 11:55 AM
NOTICE by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain Insurance Companies Subscribing to Policy Number B074021F3032, Lloyd's Underwriter Syndicate Number 1274 AUL, Volante International Limited of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss or Motion to Transfer (Booth, Curtis)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 02/19 10:47 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hunter Warfield, Inc identifying Corporate Parent HWI Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Hunter Warfield of New England, Inc., Other Affiliate Possession Partner, LLC, Other Affiliate Resident Interface LLC, Other Affiliate Hunter Warfield, Limitada, Other Affiliate Resident Advocate, LLC for Hunter Warfield, Inc.(Berman, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/13 9:29 AM
NOTICE by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain Insurance Companies Subscribing to Policy Number B074021F3032, Lloyd's Underwriter Syndicate Number 1274 AUL, Volante International Limited re1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Booth, Curtis)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 02/13 8:43 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Notice of Removal, was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet to 1 . (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Thu 02/13 8:43 AM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
4 4 cmp Complaint Thu 02/13 8:42 AM
COMPLAINT against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain Insurance Companies Subscribing to Policy Number B074021F3032, Lloyd's Underwriter Syndicate Number 1274 AUL, Volante International Limited, filed by Hunter Warfield, Inc. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
3 3 order Case Management Order Wed 02/12 3:08 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 2/12/2025. (mu1s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 02/12 2:56 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Antares Syndicate 1274, Volante International Limited identifying Corporate Parent Qatar Insurance Company QSPC, Corporate Parent Antares Global Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Antares Underwriting Limited, Corporate Parent Antares Managing Agency Limited for Antares Syndicate 1274; Corporate Parent ACRISURE, LLC for Volante International Limited.(Booth, Curtis)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 02/12 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, case number C15CV24006832. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11780545), filed by Volante International Limited, Antares Syndicate 1274.(Booth, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Complaint and Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit B State Court Docket Entries
utility Remark - State Court Docs Thu 02/13 8:43 AM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]