Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Susan K Declercq
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 2:25-cv-10416
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 8:11 AM EDT
Defendant
Magna Electric Vehicle Structures Michigan
Represented By
Thomas J. Davis
Kienbaum Hardy Viviano Pelton & Forrest, P.L.C.
contact info
William B. Forrest
Kienbaum Hardy Viviano Pelton & Forrest, P.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Indira Selimovic
Represented By
Michael L. Pitt
Pitt, Mcgehee,
contact info
James Daniel-John O'Dea
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/16 4:44 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference VIA ZOOM set for 5/1/2025 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. Zoom information will be emailed prior to conference. (KBro)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
11 11 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Mon 04/14 2:36 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Forrest, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/08 9:53 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 5/1/2025 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (KBro)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
10 10 notice Appear* Mon 04/07 4:01 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Scheduling Conference set for 4/30/2025 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (KBro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
9 9 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/02 2:58 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Magna Electric Vehicle Structures Michigan served on 2/18/2025, answer due 3/11/2025. (Pitt, Michael) Modified on 4/2/2025 (LHam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
8 8 notice Appearance Wed 03/26 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Davis on behalf of Magna Electric Vehicle Structures Michigan. (Davis, Thomas)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Wed 03/26 4:14 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Magna Electric Vehicle Structures Michigan identifying Corporate Parent Magna International, Inc. for Magna Electric Vehicle Structures Michigan. (Forrest, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/26 4:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses - Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Magna Electric Vehicle Structures Michigan. (Forrest, William)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Wed 03/26 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Forrest on behalf of Magna Electric Vehicle Structures Michigan. (Forrest, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued* Thu 02/13 10:08 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Magna Electric Vehicle Structures Michigan* (SSch)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Practice Guidelines Thu 02/13 6:56 AM
Notice of District Judge Susan K. DeClercq Practice Guidelines. (KBro)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Thu 02/13 10:09 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SSch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
2 2 notice Appearance Wed 02/12 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Daniel-John O'Dea on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (O'Dea, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 02/12 2:20 PM
COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by Indira Selimovic against Magna Electric Vehicle Structures Michigan, a division of Cosma Canada USA Group of Magna International Inc., with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10116574 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: St. Clair - County Where Action Arose: St. Clair - County of 1st Defendant: St. Clair. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Pitt, Michael)
Related: [-]