Nebraska District Court
Judge:John M Gerrard
Referred: Ryan C Carson
Case #: 8:25-cv-00079
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Terminated:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 4:28 AM CDT
Defendant
Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Eric W. Synowicki
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Omaha
contact info
Plaintiff
Francisco Hernandez
1111B S Governors Ave Suite 25136
Dover, DE 19904

GPO Apr 23 2025
)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendant's motion to dismiss (filing 5) is granted. The plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
10 10 oth_doc Response Wed 05/07 10:05 AM
RESPONSE to MOTION to Dismiss5 on behalf of Plaintiff Francisco Hernandez.(MKR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
9 9 order Judgment - Pro Se Thu 04/24 9:58 AM
JUDGMENT - PRO SE - For the reasons stated in the accompanying memorandum and order8 , the plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases
8 8 5 pgs order Memorandum and Order ~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/24 9:54 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendant's motion to dismiss (filing5 ) is granted. The plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Christopher L. Ferretti on behalf of Defendant Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Ferretti, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
6 6 oth_doc Brief Wed 03/26 2:02 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss for lacking subject matter jurisdiction 5 by Attorney Eric W. Synowicki on behalf of Defendant Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Synowicki, Eric)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss Wed 03/26 2:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for lacking subject matter jurisdiction by Attorney Eric W. Synowicki on behalf of Defendant Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Synowicki, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
4 4 3 pgs order Order - Pro Se GO 2025-01 Wed 02/12 1:07 PM
GENERAL ORDER NO. 2025-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case) Wed 02/12 1:06 PM
NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (MKR)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 02/12 1:01 PM
Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney's Office regarding Complaint1 . (MKR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/12 12:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (3) Summonses issued, with receipt number 8071632, in the amount of $ 405 filed on behalf of Plaintiff Francisco Hernandez. (MKR)
Related: [-]