New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Referred: Sarah Netburn
Case #: 1:25-cv-01259
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:216(b) FLSA: Minimum wage or overtime compensation
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 5:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Anas Abukhader
Represented By
Michael Christopher Anderson
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant
Daoud Abukhader
Represented By
Michael Christopher Anderson
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jerome Laundry Mart Inc.
Represented By
Michael Christopher Anderson
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Antonia Ramirez
Represented By
Lina Stillman
Stillman Legal, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 05/01 12:36 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: On February 13, 2025, the Honorable Paul A. Engelmayer referred this matter to my docket for general pretrial supervision. Accordingly, an Initial Pretrial Conference pursuant to Rule 16 is scheduled for Tuesday, May 20, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. At that time the parties should dial into the Court's dedicated teleconferencing line at (855) 244-8681 and enter Access Code 23142707008. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/20/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/1/2025) (dsh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/30 9:15 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Anas Abukhader, Daoud Abukhader, Jerome Laundry Mart Inc...(Anderson, Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/30 9:14 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Anas Abukhader, Daoud Abukhader, Jerome Laundry Mart Inc...(Anderson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
12 12 order Memo Endorsement Fri 03/28 2:59 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:11 ENDORSEMENT: Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by May 1, 2025. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/28/2025) (dsh)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Fri 03/28 6:29 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Anas Abukhader, Daoud Abukhader, Jerome Laundry Mart Inc...(Anderson, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/28 6:26 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Christopher Anderson on behalf of Anas Abukhader, Daoud Abukhader, Jerome Laundry Mart Inc...(Anderson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/10 5:23 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Daoud Abukhader served on 3/4/2025, answer due 3/25/2025. Service was made by MAIL/AFFIXING TO DOOR/DMV VERIFIED ADDRESS. Document filed by Antonia Ramirez..(Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/10 5:01 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Anas Abukhader served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025. Service was accepted by Duaa Abukhander. Document filed by Antonia Ramirez..(Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/04 12:40 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Jerome Laundry Mart Inc. served on 2/21/2025, answer due 3/14/2025. Service was accepted by Celita (DOE)/Front Desk Clerk. Document filed by Antonia Ramirez..(Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/24 4:49 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Jerome Laundry Mart Inc. served on 2/19/2025, answer due 3/12/2025. Service was accepted by SONIA DOE-MANAGER. Document filed by Antonia Ramirez..(Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 02/13 12:54 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/13/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 02/13 9:09 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anas Abukhader, Daoud Abukhader, Jerome Laundry Mart Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 02/13 9:06 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 02/13 9:07 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 02/13 9:07 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 02/13 9:08 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lina Stillman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code None; Jury Demand code n (None);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:216; the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff);. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/12 2:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/12 2:12 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JEROME LAUNDRY MART, INC., DAOUD ABUKHADER and ANAS ABUKHADER, individually, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Antonia Ramirez..(Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/12 2:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Anas Abukhader, Daoud Abukhader, Jerome Laundry Mart Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30608351)Document filed by Antonia Ramirez..(Stillman, Lina)
Related: [-]