Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Bridget Meehan Brennan
Case #: 1:25-cv-00273
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 6:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Fahrenheit Cleveland LLC
Represented By
Eric R. Magnus
Jackson Lewis - Atlanta
contact info
Stephanie E. Harley
Jackson Lewis - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Amiyah Hale
Represented By
Stephan I. Voudris
Voudris Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Fri 04/11 11:18 AM
Order [non-document]: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer (Doc.7 ) is GRANTED. The deadline to answer is 5/28/2025. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 4/11/25. (T,A)
Related: [-]
order Order Fri 04/11 11:22 AM
Order [non-document]: A telephonic status conference is set for 6/2/2025 at 3:00 p.m. to discuss the procedure for promptly addressing any potential Motion for Court-Approved Notice to Other Employees. The parties are directed to meet and confer regarding: (1) whether Plaintiff intends to move for Court-Approved Notice to Other Employees and/or whether Defendant intends to stipulate to or oppose Plaintiff's proposed collective action; (2) proposed expedited discovery dates, a proposed briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Court-Approved Notice to Other Employees (if not stipulated to), and a proposed hearing date; and (3) any other matters requiring the Court's immediate attention. A joint status report summarizing the meet-and-confer and proposing a timeline consistent with the topics identified herein, must be filed with the Court on or before 5/29/2025. The Court will host the conference call and inform counsel by way of email of the telephone number for the conference. The parties shall dial into the Court's bridge line at least five minutes prior to the scheduled conference time. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 4/11/25. (T,A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
7 7 motion Extension (answer complaint) Wed 04/09 4:47 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until May 28, 2025 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Fahrenheit Cleveland LLC. (Harley, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Thu 03/20 10:31 AM
Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Eric R. Magnus for Fahrenheit Cleveland LLC. (Doc.6 ). Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 3/20/25.(T,A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/19 4:39 PM
Motion for attorney Eric R. Magnus to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-13012407, filed by Defendant Fahrenheit Cleveland LLC.(Harley, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Verified Statement and Oath of Eric R. Magnus, Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, March 06, 2025
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/06 5:19 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Fahrenheit Cleveland LLC. filed on behalf of Fahrenheit Cleveland LLC (Harley, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Thu 03/06 5:18 PM
Attorney Appearance by Stephanie E. Harley filed by on behalf of Fahrenheit Cleveland LLC. (Harley, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
3 3 order Initial Order - Judge Brennan Thu 02/13 11:25 AM
Initial Standing Order. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 2/13/25. (T,A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Wed 02/12 3:21 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Fahrenheit Cleveland LLC. (B,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/12 3:00 PM
Collective Action Complaint for unpaid Minimum Wages with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 405.00, Receipt number AOHNDC-12954379. Filed by Amiyah Hale. (Voudris, Stephan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to be a Party Plaintiff,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judge Wed 02/12 3:14 PM
Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (B,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Wed 02/12 3:15 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (B,Ch)
Related: [-]