Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Aida M Delgado-Colon
Case #: 3:25-cv-01090
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 6:37 AM AST
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Diomi-Doe
Defendant
Dr. Pierre M. Diomi
710 12th St. So., Apt. 2117
Arlington, VA 22202
Defendant
Jane Doe
Plaintiff
Anjanette Lopez-Agustini
Altos de Torrimar, Carr. 177 Los Filtros #2 Casa Linda Apartments Apt 408 C
Guaynabo, PR 00959
Represented By
Alberto J. Farmer-Del Toro
Guzman & Rodriguez-Lopez Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM AST
Saturday, April 26, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 04/26 7:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Humberto Guzman-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Guzman-Rodriguez, Humberto)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
5 5 motion Issuance of Summons Fri 04/25 11:33 AM
Second MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants filed by Alberto J. Farmer-Del Toro on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/9/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Farmer-Del Toro, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Monday, April 14, 2025
4 4 motion Informative Motion Issuance of Summons Mon 04/14 4:12 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion, MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants filed by Alberto J. Farmer-Del Toro on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 4/28/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Farmer-Del Toro, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXH A- Email,
Att: 2 Summons Summons Dr. Diomi
Thursday, February 13, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 02/13 8:33 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
2 2 service Request for Waiver of Service Wed 02/12 5:02 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service of Summons sent to Dr. Pierre Diomi on February 12, 2025 by All Plaintiffs. Waiver of Service due by 4/14/2025. (Farmer-Del Toro, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXH A- Email,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXH B- Notice and Request Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit EXH C- Waiver Form
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/12 4:00 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number CPRDC-8988557.), filed by ANJANETTE LOPEZ AGUSTINI. Service due by 5/13/2025,(Farmer-Del Toro, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Sheet for Humberto Guzman, Esq.,
Att: 3 Category Sheet for Alberto Farmer del Toro, Esq.