Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Colin Stirling Bruce
Referred: Eric I Long
Case #: 2:25-cv-02038
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1345 Property Damage
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 4:14 AM CDT
Defendant
Greenfield Contractors LLC
Plaintiff
Penn Millers Insurance Company
Represented By
Alex Ottenheimer
Cozen O'Connor
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, March 06, 2025
3 3 misc 7.1 Disclosure Statement Thu 03/06 12:08 PM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Penn Millers Insurance Company. (Ottenheimer, Alex)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/05 9:16 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Penn Millers Insurance Company. Greenfield Contractors LLC waiver sent on 2/28/2025, answer due 4/29/2025. (Ottenheimer, Alex)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
1 1 7 pgs cmp Attorney Complaint Wed 02/12 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Greenfield Contractors, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILCDC-4669788.), filed by Penn Millers Insurance Company a/s/o Effingham Equity.(Ottenheimer, Alex)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Contract bet. Effingham and Greenfield,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet