United States of America v. Lopez et al
Texas Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Randy Crane |
Case #: | 7:25-cv-00065 |
Nature of Suit | 210 Real Property - Land Condemnation |
Cause | 28:1358 Land Condemnation |
Case Filed: | Feb 12, 2025 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 5:50 AM CDT |
Defendant
Alberto Valadez
24181 River Road Dr.
San Benito, TX 78586 |
|
Defendant
Diana S. Valadez
62174 Duke Dr.
Corpus Christi, TX 78414 |
|
Defendant
Daniel David Valadez
2989 N. 44th St., Unit 3036
Phoenix, AZ 85018 |
|
Defendant
Cynthia Imelda Valadez
808 W. 6th St.
Taylor, TX 76574 |
|
Defendant
Brigitte G. Valadez
1013 Southside Dr.
Angleton, TX 77515 |
|
Defendant
Brenda Lee Valadez
6217 Duke Dr.
Corpus Christi, TX 78414 |
|
Defendant
Brandon Valadez
602 Seawolf Pkwy, Apt. 523A
Galveston, TX 77554 |
|
Defendant
Amelia Del Angel Valadez
106 KCTM FM 103 Rd.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Alfonso Valadez
112 KCTM FM 103 Rd.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Alex Xavier Valadez
800 Crown Ct
Keller, TX 76248 |
|
Defendant
Dolores Valadez
1498 Old Golf Course Rd.
Belton, TX 76513 |
|
Defendant
Norma Montalvo Trevino
517 Shea Dr.
Alamo, TX 78516 |
|
Defendant
Ameida Salinas Starr Cty Tax Assessor
100 N. FM 3167, Ste. 201
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Amalia Valadez Solis
203 Live Oak Dr.
Freeport, TX 77541 |
|
Defendant
Maria Guadalupe Serna Valadez
1498 Old Golf Course Rd.
Belton, TX 76513 |
|
Defendant
Maricela Romero
216 E. Jefferson St.
Hillsboro, KS 67063 |
|
Defendant
Macedonio Romero
5865 Highway 59 S
Mason, TN 38049 |
|
Defendant
Silvia Valadez Robinson
2717 Bluebird Avenue
McAllen, TX 78504 |
|
Defendant
Gloria L. Rios
4977 E. US Highway 83
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Ruben Montalvo, Sr.
114 KCTM FM 103 Rd.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Olga Linda Valadez
111 KCTM FM 103 Rd.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Juan Antonio Valadez, Sr.
1808 Echols St.
Bryan, TX 77801 |
|
Defendant
Charles David Valadez, Sr.
508 Castle Bay Dr.
Spicewood, TX 78669 |
|
Defendant
Manuel Valadez, Jr.
4304 Saint Francis Ave A
Dallas, TX 75227 |
|
Defendant
Armando G. Valadez, Jr.
2622 Wainwright St.
Corpus Christi, TX 78405 |
|
Defendant
Liliana Gloria Valadez Beavers
2808 Tanager Dr.
Mesquite, TX 75181 |
|
Defendant
Robert Allen Valadez
7373 Broadway St., Ste. 508
San Antonio, TX 78209 |
|
Defendant
Rita Valadez
1001 N. 17th St.
Temple, TX 76501 |
|
Defendant
Reynaldo Montalvo, Jr.
110 KCTM FM 103 Rd.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Noel Dennis Valadez
2808 Tanager Dr.
Mesquite, TX 75181 |
|
Defendant
Jerry Valadez
5650 Lilac Willow
San Antonio, TX 78253 |
|
Defendant
Jennifer Valadez
16406 Pierce St.
Omaha, NE 68130 |
|
Defendant
Javier Antonio Valadez
2824 W. 9th St.
Dallas, TX 75211 |
|
Defendant
Irasema Valadez
123 W. Avenue H
Robstown, TX 78380 |
|
Defendant
Humberto Valadez
1705 W. Douglas St., Apt. 4
Pharr, TX 78577 |
|
Defendant
George Valadez
125 Waterlily St.
Lake Jackson, TX 77566 |
|
Defendant
Garrett c/o Patti Pries Valadez
9147 Bretshire Dr.
Dallas, TX 75228 |
|
Defendant
Eloy Felix Valadez
1498 Old Golf Course Rd.
Belton, TX 76513 |
|
Defendant
Edward Valadez
6622 Lens Dr.
Corpus Christi, TX 78414 |
|
Defendant
Valeriano De La Garza, III
5133 E. US Highway 83
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Roberto Juan Lopez
302 W. Santa Maria St.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Rene Homero Lopez
4630 Kosarek Dr.
Corpus Christi, TX 78415 |
|
Defendant
Leticia L. Lopez
702 E. Water St.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Betty Lee Lopez
4630 Kosarek Dr.
Corpus Christi, TX 78415 |
|
Defendant
Ana Elizabeth Lopez
4514 Carroll Ln
Corpus Christi, TX 78415 |
|
Defendant
Elizabeth Gonzalez
406 N. Arredondo St.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Katrina Garza
20832 E. 191st St. S
Haskell, OK 74436 |
|
Defendant
Eloisa C. Garza
712 E. Griffin Pkwy
Mission, TX 78572 |
|
Defendant
Olga Valadez Falcon
220 KCTM FM 103 Rd.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Nelda M. Diaz
110 Casita Cemetery Rd.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Valeriano c/o Iliana DLG De La Garza, Jr.
6805 Rio Concho St.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Sylvia Lopez
4436 E. Mile 131/2 North
Mercedes, TX 78570 |
|
Defendant
Roberto A. De La Garza
3416 Black Brush St.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Iliana A. De La Garza
6805 Rio Concho St.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Amy A. De La Garza
606 Spruce St.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Alejo Clarke, Jr.
49 Wood St.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dora Valadez Bosquez
2805 Quamasia Avenue
McAllen, TX 78504 |
|
Defendant
Jose Javier Alaniz
116 KCTM FM 103 Rd.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Isidra M. Alaniz
116 KCTM FM 103 Rd.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Annik Alaniz
308 Campbell Dr., Lot 4
Canyon Lake, TX 78133 |
|
Defendant
Ongela Garza Abudawoud
7506 Boxwood Ridge Ln
Richmond, TX 77407 |
|
Defendant
0.762 Acres of Land, More or Less Situated in Starr County, State of Texas
|
|
Defendant
Jose J Montalvo
6009 FM 1430
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Gilberto Montalvo, Jr.
225 W. Huisache St.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Yolanda Montalvo
110 KCTM FM 103 Rd
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Sara C. Montalvo
225 W. Huisache St.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Sandra Montalvo
2603 Dove Avenue
Mission, TX 78574 |
|
Defendant
Odessa Jannette Montalvo
12311 Culebra Rd., Apt. 12103
San Antonio, TX 78253 |
|
Defendant
Michael Lee Montalvo
419 Lito Garza St.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Mauro Montalvo
49 Montalvo Hill Rd.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Maria Luisa Montalvo
6295 FM 1430
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Jose Jesus Montalvo
3600 Goldcrest Avenue
McAllen, TX 78504 |
|
Defendant
Jorge Montalvo
39 Montalvo Hill Rd.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Graciela Montalvo
2353 Friarcreek Loop
Roundrock, TX 78664 |
|
Defendant
Epifanio Pipo Montalvo
55 Montalvo Hill Rd.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Arturo Montalvo
6333 FM 1430 1430 N
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Anna Maria McCrory
21301 Rabb Rd.
Santa Rosa, TX 78593 |
|
Defendant
Siobhan A. McCrea
923 Pamela Dr.
Mission, TX 78572 |
|
Defendant
Jesus Maria Lopez, Jr.
4985 E. US Highway 83
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Yvette Lopez
1010 Locke St., Apt. 11102
San Antonio, TX 78208 |
|
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
David Joe Valadez
Terminated: 03/06/2025
2609 E. Mile 4 Rd.
Mission, TX 78573 |
|
Defendant
Adan Valadez
Terminated: 03/13/2025
24302 Wild Horse Ln
Hockley, TX 77447 |
|
Defendant
Jose Angel Valadez, Sr.
Terminated: 03/06/2025
6041/2 N. Lincoln St.
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Oscar Ruben Valadez, Jr.
Terminated: 03/13/2025
855 E. Cooper St.
Seymour, TX 76380 |
|
Defendant
Roel Valadez
Terminated: 03/06/2025
30 El Mesquite Ln E1
Rio Grande City, TX 78582 |
|
Defendant
Devin McCrea
Terminated: 03/17/2025
923 Pamela Dr.
Mission, TX 78572 |
|
Defendant
Brian McCrea
Terminated: 03/13/2025
923 Pamela Dr.
Mission, TX 78572 |