California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 2:25-cv-01227
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1335 Interpleader Action
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 3:44 AM PDT
Defendant
Laddi Truck Lines Inc.
Defendant
Matthew E. Little
Defendant
Cindy Sanchez
Defendant
Hardeep Singh
Defendant
Lakhrvir Singh
Defendant
Yuvi Carrier Inc.
Plaintiff
Wilshire Insurance Company
Represented By
Ray Tamaddon
Sinnott Puebla Campagne And Curet, Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
19 19 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 05/01 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Wilshire Insurance Company. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Tamaddon, Ray)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 05/01 11:19 AM
MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Percy Anderson. Generally, defendants must answer the complaint within 21 days after service (60 days if the defendant is the United States). Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(1). In the present case, it appears that this time period has not been met. Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before May 7, 2025, why Defendants Matthew E. Little, Hardeep Singh, Yuvi Carrier Inc., Laddi Truck Lines Inc., and Lakhrvir Singh should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
17 17 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/25 12:55 PM
ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S STATUS REPORT by Judge Percy Anderson. After full consideration of the Wilshire Insurance Company's request for a reprieve of 40 days of all pending deadlines due to the pending finalization of the settlement reached among the parties, IT IS ORDERED that the parties have ten (10) days from the date of this order or until the next scheduled court appearance, whichever is shorter, to file with the court a dismissal of the action or to appear, in-person or telephonically with their clients, to place the settlement on the record. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
16 16 misc Status Report Fri 03/21 3:25 PM
STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST FOR A 40-DAY REPRIEVE OF ALL PENDING DEADLINES PENDING FINALIZATION OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; [PROPOSED ORDER] filed by Plaintiff Wilshire Insurance Company. (Tamaddon, Ray)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 03/10 10:32 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Wilshire Insurance Company, upon Defendant Laddi Truck Lines Inc. served on 3/2/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Laddi Truck Lines Inc., Harpreet Singh-Authorized Agent in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Tamaddon, Ray)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 02/27 10:18 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Wilshire Insurance Company, upon Defendant Lakhrvir Singh served on 2/26/2025, answer due 3/19/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lakhrvir Singh, an Individual in compliance with statute not specified by personal service (Tamaddon, Ray)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
13 13 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 02/26 1:41 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document lacks required signature. Proof of Service is missing the signature of the Person who served papers. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 02/25 1:14 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Wilshire Insurance Company, upon Defendant Yuvi Carrier Inc. served on 2/22/2025, answer due 3/17/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hardeep Singh- Agent for Service in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Tamaddon, Ray)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 02/25 1:12 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Wilshire Insurance Company, upon Defendant Hardeep Singh served on 2/22/2025, answer due 3/17/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hardeep Singh, Owner in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Tamaddon, Ray)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/18 8:17 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Wilshire Insurance Company. upon Matthew E. Little waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/14/2025, answer due 4/15/2025. Waiver of Service signed by Chris D. Edgington, Attorney for Matthew W. Little, an Individual. (Tamaddon, Ray)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 02/13 3:27 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 02/13 10:25 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),2 as to Defendants Laddi Truck Lines Inc., Matthew E. Little, Cindy Sanchez, Hardeep Singh, Lakhrvir Singh, Yuvi Carrier Inc.. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Yuvi Carrier Inc.,
Att: 2 Laddi Truck Lines Inc.,
Att: 3 Hardeep Singh,
Att: 4 Cindy Sanchez,
Att: 5 Lakhrvir Singh
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 02/13 10:21 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 02/13 10:20 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 02/13 10:20 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 02/12 5:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wilshire Insurance Company, a North Carolina Corporation, identifying Plaintiff Wilshire Insurance Company, is owned by Occidental Fire & Casualty Co. of NC, which is wholly owned by IAT Insurance Group, Inc., which is wholly owned by IAT Reinsurance Company Ltd., which is wholly owned by Goose Creek Capital, Inc., 100% of the voting shares of Goose Creek Capital, Inc. are owned by Peter R. Kellogg. (Tamaddon, Ray)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Wed 02/12 4:56 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),2 filed by Plaintiff Wilshire Insurance Company, a North Carolina Corporation.(Tamaddon, Ray)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons to Cindy Sanchez,
Att: 2 Summons to Lakhrvir Singh,
Att: 3 Summons to Laddi Truck Lines Inc.,
Att: 4 Summons to Hardeep Singh dba Yuvi Truck Line,
Att: 5 Summons to Yuvi Carrier, Inc.
2 2 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/12 4:11 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39097698 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Wilshire Insurance Company, a North Carolina Corporation. (Attorney Ray Tamaddon added to party Wilshire Insurance Company, a North Carolina Corporation(pty:pla))(Tamaddon, Ray)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 02/12 4:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wilshire Insurance Company, a North Carolina Corporation. (Tamaddon, Ray)
Related: [-]