Rhode Island District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00010
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 13, 2025 2:18 AM EST
Defendant
Reynaldo Martinez (1)
Represented By
Kensley R. Barrett
Marin & Barrett, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Peter I. Roklan
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/13/2025 3:28 AM EST
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
Arrest of Reynaldo Martinez (Noel, Jeannine) [1:24-mj-00094-LDA]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Reynaldo Martinez. Initial Appearance set for 11/20/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond.(Noel, Jeannine) [1:24-mj-00094-LDA]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond:Initial Appearance as to Reynaldo Martinez held on 11/20/2024, Detention Hearing as to Reynaldo Martinez held on 11/20/2024 (Roklan, Barrett) USPO Donohue; All parties present; Deft present; Court informs Deft of rights and charges; Deft understands rights and charges; CJA appointed; Due Process Act Order entered; Waiver of Preliminary Exam; Court informs Deft of rights; Deft understands rights and waiver; Deft waives hearing; Court accepts waiver as knowing and voluntary; Govt addresses the Court and requests detention; Deft Counsel addresses the Court; No bail argument; Bail/Detention hearing scheduled; USPO addresses the Court; Pending Supervised Release Violation in 1:17CR56JJM-LDA; Court addresses Govt; Deft remanded pending hearing ( Detention/Bail Hearing set for 12/2/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond.)(Court Reporter FTR in Courtroom A at 3:16 PM.)(Noel, Jeannine) [1:24-mj-00094-LDA]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Reynaldo Martinez. Detention/Bond Hearing set for 12/2/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond.(Noel, Jeannine) [1:24-mj-00094-LDA]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Reynaldo Martinez (1).(Noel, Jeannine) [1:24-mj-00094-LDA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING CJA PANEL ATTORNEY as to Reynaldo Martinez: the Panel Attorney appointed as CJA Counsel is Kensley R. Barrett for Reynaldo Martinez. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 11/20/2024. (Noel, Jeannine) [1:24-mj-00094-LDA]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER PURSUANT TO DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT as to Reynaldo Martinez. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 11/20/2024. (Noel, Jeannine) [1:24-mj-00094-LDA]
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Reynaldo Martinez accepted by MJ Almond (Noel, Jeannine) [1:24-mj-00094-LDA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
7 7 ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 11/19/2024 Pawtucket, RI. in case as to Reynaldo Martinez. (Noel, Jeannine) [1:24-mj-00094-LDA]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond: Detention/Bond Hearing as to Reynaldo Martinez held on 12/2/2024 (Roklan, Barrett) USPO Miles; All parties present; Deft present; Court reviews case; Court addresses parties; Govt requests detention; No bail argument; Deft remanded(Court Reporter FTR in Courtroom A at 10:14 am.)(Noel, Jeannine) [1:24-mj-00094-LDA]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Reynaldo Martinez. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 12/2/2024.(Noel, Jeannine) [1:24-mj-00094-LDA]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
9 9 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Reynaldo Martinez. Responses due by 12/30/2024. (Roklan, Peter) [1:24-mj-00094-LDA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
TEXT ORDER - The Court having reviewed9 Motion for Extension of Time to Indictment as to Reynaldo Martinez (1) and finding that, for the reasons stated therein, the ends of justice served by the requested continuance outweigh the interest of the public and defendant in a speedy trial, the motion is granted and the period from 12/20/2024 to 1/19/2025 shall be excludable in computing time under the Speedy Trial Act. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 12/18/2024.(Noel, Jeannine) [1:24-mj-00094-LDA]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
TEXT ORDER - The Court having reviewed the10 Motion for Extension of Time to Indictment as to Reynaldo Martinez (1) and finding that, for the reasons stated therein, the ends of justice served by the requested continuance outweigh the interest of the public and defendant in a speedy trial, the motion is granted and the period from 1/19/2025 to 2/18/2025 shall be excludable in computing time under the Speedy Trial Act. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/13/2025.(Noel, Jeannine) [1:24-mj-00094-LDA]
Related: [-]
10 10 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Reynaldo Martinez. Responses due by 1/27/2025. (Roklan, Peter) [1:24-mj-00094-LDA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED Related Case Number 1:17CR56JJM-LDA based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Noel, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
11 11 INFORMATION as to Reynaldo Martinez (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4.(Noel, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet Attachment,
Att: 3 Proposed Waiver
13 13 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Reynaldo Martinez (Noel, Jeannine)
Related: [-]