California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 2:25-cv-01124
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2025
Terminated:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 2:26 AM PDT
Defendant
President Donald J. Trump
Defendant
Vice President JD Vance
Plaintiff
U.S. Senator Cory Booker
Plaintiff
U.S. Senator Alvin L. Bragg, Jr.
Plaintiff
U.S. Rep Alex Ocasio-Cortez
Plaintiff
U.S. Senator Rand Paul
Plaintiff
U.S. Senator Bernie Sanders
Plaintiff
U.S. Senator Adam Schiff
Plaintiff
U.S. Senator Jack Smith
Plaintiff
Dmt Mac Truong
35 Jouranl Square Suite 419
Jersey City, NJ 07306
Plaintiff
U.S. Senator Elizabeth Warren


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
8 8 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis Amend/Correct Thu 03/13 1:34 PM
ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Denying2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Non-Prisoner Case). In light of this dismissal, the Request (ECF No. 2) is DENIED, and all other pending matters are TERMINATED6 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (twdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
7 7 respm Declaration (Motion related) Wed 03/05 5:17 PM
PLAINTIFF PRO SE Dmt MAC TRUONG'S AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' Leave to File an AMENDED COMPLAINT under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1),1 ,6 filed by Plaintiff Mac Truong. (san)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Amend/Correct Wed 03/05 5:14 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1), To File Amended Complaint with Amended Caption1 filed by Plaintiff Mac Truong. (san) (san)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/5/2025) Amended Complaint
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Wed 02/12 10:59 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
4 4 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 02/12 10:57 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Complaint - Related [+],1 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. Other error(s) with document(s): No Civil Cover Sheet. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
Related: [-] ferred
3 3 notice Summons Request Wed 02/12 10:17 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - Related [+],1 filed by plaintiff Mac Truong. (ghap)
Related: [-] ferred
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 02/12 10:15 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed with Action In Forma Pauperis filed by plaintiff Mac Truong. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order
1 1 54 pgs cmp Complaint - (Referred) Wed 02/12 10:12 AM
COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Donald J. Trump, JD Vance Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott., filed by plaintiffs Cory Booker, Jack Smith, Rand Paul, Bernie Sanders, Adam Schiff, Alex Ocasio-Cortez, Mac Truong, Elizabeth Warren, Alvin L. Bragg, Jr. (ghap)
Related: [-]