Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Case #: 6:25-cv-00239
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1693 Electronic Fund Transfer Act (EFTA)
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025
Terminated:Feb 19, 2025
Case in other court:County Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit, 2024-CC-025699-O
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 6:53 AM EDT
Defendant
Clarity Services, Inc.
Represented By
Grant Edward Lavelle Schnell
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
AFS CS
Plaintiff
Tiffany Gelly
Represented By
Christian Earl Cok
Seraph Legal, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, February 20, 2025
12 12 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 02/20 11:26 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LSS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 02/19 12:30 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case with Prejudice re 10 Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 2/19/2025. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of settlement Tue 02/18 11:12 AM
NOTICE of settlement as to all Parties by Tiffany Gelly (Cok, Christian)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 02/18 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order Tue 02/18 10:14 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective April 1, 2024, and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued a Standing Order, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 2/18/2025. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/14 2:01 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 Clarity Services, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Movant shall have up to and including March 24, 2025, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Samuel J. Horovitz on 2/14/2025. (KTQ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Thu 02/13 11:18 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal by Clarity Services, Inc.. (Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 02/13 3:13 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 6:25-cv-239-WWB-UAM. (TNP)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 02/13 8:59 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Clarity Services, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/13 8:58 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Clarity Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Corporate Parent Experian Holdings, Inc. for Clarity Services, Inc.. (Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 02/13 8:57 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Grant Edward Lavelle Schnell on behalf of Clarity Services, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Grant Schnell. (Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 02/13 1:30 AM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, Florida, case number 2024-CC-025699-O filed in State Court on 12/24/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-23017194 filed by Clarity Services, Inc..(Schnell, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - AFS CS d/b/a Three Sticks Lending's Consent to Removal,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet