New Jersey District Court
Judge:Edward S Kiel
Referred: Elizabeth A Pascal
Case #: 1:25-cv-01218
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 7:11 AM EDT
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-5
Defendant
JOHN DOES 6-10
Defendant
DGMB CASINO, LLC
Plaintiff
DONIQUE WILLIAMS
Represented By
MIRIAM S. EDELSTEIN
Costello, Mains & Silverman, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
7 7 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Fri 05/02 4:27 PM
Order Initial Conference set for 5/28/2025 at 11:00 AM in Camden - Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 05/02/2025. (aji, )
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/02 10:29 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by DGMB CASINO, LLC.(LICHTENSTEIN, RUSSELL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
5 5 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 04/03 11:18 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to DGMB Casino, LLC d/b/a Resorts Casino Hotel.. (LICHTENSTEIN, RUSSELL)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/03 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN on behalf of DGMB CASINO, LLC (LICHTENSTEIN, RUSSELL)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Thu 04/03 2:50 PM
CLERK'S TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer - Document5 submitted by DGMB CASINO, LLC on 4/3/2025 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/1/2025. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/28 1:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DONIQUE WILLIAMS. DGMB CASINO, LLC served on 3/27/2025, answer due 4/17/2025. (EDELSTEIN, MIRIAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 02/14 9:20 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to DGMB CASINO, LLC, JOHN DOES 1-5, JOHN DOES 6-10. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kes, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Fillable PDF Fri 02/14 9:00 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Civil Cover Sheet 1-1 filed by MIRIAM EDELSTEIN on 2/13/2025 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (kes, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Fri 02/14 9:04 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (kes, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Fri 02/14 9:09 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (kes, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/13 8:55 AM
COMPLAINT against DGMB Casino, LLC, d/b/a Resorts Casino Hotel, JOHN DOES 1-5, JOHN DOES 6-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16014482) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DONIQUE WILLIAMS.(EDELSTEIN, MIRIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 02/13 1:38 PM
Judge Edward S. Kiel and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (mmb)
Related: [-]