Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:25-cv-00171
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 4:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Lenovo Group Limited
Defendant
Motorola (Wuhan) Mobility Technologies Communication Company Limited
Represented By
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Motorola Mobile Communication Technology Ltd.
Represented By
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Defendant
OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited
Plaintiff
Longitude Licensing Ltd.
Represented By
Jessica Perry
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky And Popeo, P.C.
contact info
Tianyi Tan
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovasky & Popeo Pc - Boston
contact info
Adam S Rizk
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovasky & Popeo Pc - Boston
contact info
Andrea Leigh Fair
Miller Fair Henry PLLC
contact info
Matthew A Karambelas
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovasky & Popeo Pc - Boston
contact info
Plaintiff
Marlin Semiconductor Limited
Represented By
Jessica Perry
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky And Popeo, P.C.
contact info
Tianyi Tan
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovasky & Popeo Pc - Boston
contact info
Adam S Rizk
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovasky & Popeo Pc - Boston
contact info
Andrea Leigh Fair
Miller Fair Henry PLLC
contact info
Matthew A Karambelas
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovasky & Popeo Pc - Boston
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
29 29 2 pgs order Order Staying Case Fri 04/25 10:57 AM
ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/23/25. (jbe)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
28 28 motion Stay Fri 04/18 4:07 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay ACTION PENDING ITC DETERMINATION by Lenovo Group Limited, Motorola (Wuhan) Mobility Technologies Communication Company Limited, Motorola Mobile Communication Technology Ltd., OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited.(Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 17, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 04/17 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James E Quigley on behalf of Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited (Quigley, James)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 04/17 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Truelove on behalf of Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited (Truelove, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/14 5:03 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Lenovo Group Limited.(Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 10, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/10 12:15 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Lenovo Group Limited.(Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing/Deadline Wed 04/09 11:39 AM
ORDER Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2025 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/8/25. (bga)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
22 22 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/31 3:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Longitude Licensing Ltd., Marlin Semiconductor Limited. OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. served on 3/25/2025. (Fair, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
21 21 service Summons Issued Tue 03/25 11:25 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd.. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
20 20 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 03/20 8:23 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Motorola Mobile Communication Technology Ltd. answer is now due 5/23/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(NKL)
Related: [-]
19 19 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 03/20 8:22 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Motorola (Wuhan) Mobility Technologies Communication Company Limited answer is now due 5/23/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(NKL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
18 18 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 03/19 6:47 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Motorola Mobile Communication Technology Ltd.. Summons originally served on 3/18/2025. Agreed new answer date is 5/23/2025.(Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
17 17 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 03/19 6:45 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Motorola (Wuhan) Mobility Technologies Communication Company Limited. Summons originally served on 3/18/2025. Agreed new answer date is 5/23/2025.(Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/13 3:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Longitude Licensing Ltd., Marlin Semiconductor Limited. Lenovo Group Limited served on 3/7/2025. (Fair, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
15 15 service Summons Issued Wed 03/12 4:57 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd.. (NKL)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Wed 03/12 3:09 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Motorola (Wuhan) Mobility Technologies Communication Company Limited, Motorola Mobile Communication Technology Ltd..(NKL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Attachment(s)
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/05 4:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Longitude Licensing Ltd., Marlin Semiconductor Limited. Motorola (Wuhan) Mobility Technologies Communication Company Limited served on 2/26/2025. (Fair, Andrea)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/05 4:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Longitude Licensing Ltd., Marlin Semiconductor Limited. Motorola Mobile Communication Technology Ltd. served on 2/26/2025. (Fair, Andrea)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/05 9:30 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Longitude Licensing Ltd., Marlin Semiconductor Limited. Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited waiver sent on 2/28/2025, answer due 5/29/2025. (Fair, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/28 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew A Karambelas on behalf of Longitude Licensing Ltd., Marlin Semiconductor Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10701646. (Karambelas, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/26 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Tianyi Tan on behalf of Longitude Licensing Ltd., Marlin Semiconductor Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10697304. (Tan, Tianyi)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/26 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jessica Perry on behalf of Longitude Licensing Ltd., Marlin Semiconductor Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10697033. (Perry, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 02/19 3:43 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Lenovo Group Limited, Motorola (Wuhan) Mobility Technologies Communication Company Limited c/o Motorola Mobility LLC, Motorola Mobile Communication Technology Ltd. c/o Motorola Mobility LLC.(NKL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Attachment(s),
Att: 2 Additional Attachment(s)
Thursday, February 13, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge Thu 02/13 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Adam S Rizk on behalf of Longitude Licensing Ltd., Marlin Semiconductor Limited (Rizk, Adam)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 02/13 10:10 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Lenovo Group Limited, Motorola (Wuhan) Mobility Technologies Communication Company Limited, Motorola Mobile Communication Technology Ltd., OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited.(NKL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Attachment(s),
Att: 2 Additional Attachment(s),
Att: 3 Additional Attachment(s),
Att: 4 Additional Attachment(s)
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Thu 02/13 9:39 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fair, Andrea)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Jury Demand Thu 02/13 9:37 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Longitude Licensing Ltd., Marlin Semiconductor Limited. (Fair, Andrea)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 02/13 9:36 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Longitude Licensing Ltd., Marlin Semiconductor Limited identifying Corporate Parent Meridian IP Ireland, Ltd. for Longitude Licensing Ltd., Marlin Semiconductor Limited. (Fair, Andrea)
Related: [-]
1 1 55 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/13 9:32 AM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Lenovo Group Limited, Motorola (Wuhan) Mobility Technologies Communication Company Limited, Motorola Mobile Communication Technology Ltd., OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10674752.), filed by Longitude Licensing Ltd., Marlin Semiconductor Limited.(Fair, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - '847 Patent,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - '473 Patent,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - '747 Patent,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - '292 Patent,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - '880 Patent,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 02/13 9:58 AM
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap added. (KLC)
Related: [-]