Colorado District Court
Judge:Lewis T Babcock
Case #: 1:25-cv-00479
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025
Terminated:May 07, 2025
Case in other court:Denver County District Court, 25cv000017
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 3:39 AM MDT
Defendant
City and County of Denver
Colorado 201 W Colfax Dept. 1108
Denver, CO 80202
Represented By
Jonathan K. Cooper
Denver City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Andres Manuel Alers
Denver City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Beth Faragher
Represented By
Sara Ludke Cook
Vaughan & Demuro
contact info
Defendant
Ashley Hinds
Represented By
Jonathan K. Cooper
Denver City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Andres Manuel Alers
Denver City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Michelle Kline
Represented By
Jonathan K. Cooper
Denver City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Andres Manuel Alers
Denver City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregory Majersky
1284 Sable Blvd
Aurora, CO 80011


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
42 42 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 05/07 11:49 AM
JUDGMENT by Clerk re:41 Order on 05/07/2025. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
41 41 4 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 05/07 11:46 AM
Order by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 05/07/2025. ORDERED that Plaintiff's objections to the Recommendation (ECF No.40 ) are overruled. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge (ECF No.37 ) is accepted and adopted. The Second Amended District Court Complaint (ECF No.32 ) is Dismissed Without Prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Michelle Kline and Beth Faragher are Dismissed With Prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Ashley Hinds are Dismissed With Prejudice. Plaintiffs claims against Defendant City and County of Denver, Colorado are Dismissed Without Prejudice. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice. Judge Faragher's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.21 ) is Denied as Moot. The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (ECF No.26 ) filed by Jonathan K. Cooper is Granted. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
40 40 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Fri 05/02 10:40 AM
OBJECTION to37 Report and Recommendations filed by Plaintiff Gregory Majersky.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
39 39 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/23 9:36 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 04/23/2025. Andres Alers, as counsel of record for Defendants City and County of Denver, Ashley Hinds, and Michelle Kline ("Defendants"), has filed a Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (ECF No.34 ). Mr. Alers' request to withdraw as counsel for Defendants in this action, is GRANTED. Mr. Alers is relieved of further representation of Defendants in this matter. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
38 38 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion for Entry of Default Mon 04/21 10:36 AM
Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 04/21/2025. Plaintiff's "Motion for Expedited Summary Judgment Against Defendant Ashley Hinds, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 56" (ECF No.22 ), "Motion for Expedited Summary Judgment Against Defendant Michelle Kline, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 56" (ECF No.23 ), "Motion for Amended Expedited Summary Judgment Against Defendant Michelle Kline, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 56" (ECF No.27 ), "Amended Motion for Expedited Summary Judgment Against Defendant Ashley Hinds, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 56" (ECF No.28 ), "Motion for Expedited Summary Judgment Against Defendant Faragher Beth Faragher, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 56" (ECF No.29 ), "Request for Clerk's Entry of Default" (ECF No.24 ), and "Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against the City and County of Denver, Colorado" (ECF No.30 ) are DENIED. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Report and Recommendations Mon 04/21 9:58 AM
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re32 Second Amended Complaint filed by Gregory Majersky, by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 04/21/2025. (Objections to R&R due by 5/5/2025.) (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
36 36 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 04/18 1:57 PM
Order of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 04/18/2025. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1, United States Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action. (All future pleadings should be designated as 25-cv-00479-LTB-RTG .) (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
35 35 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 04/17 9:56 AM
Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 04/17/2025. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge. (This case has been directly reassigned to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley for all further proceedings. (All future pleadings should be designated as 25-cv-00479-LTB .) (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
34 34 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/15 11:03 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants City and County of Denver, Ashley Hinds, Michelle Kline. (Alers, Andres)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 04/14 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Alan Wolf on behalf of City and County of Denver, Ashley Hinds, Michelle KlineAttorney Robert Alan Wolf added to party City and County of Denver(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Alan Wolf added to party Ashley Hinds(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Alan Wolf added to party Michelle Kline(pty:dft) (Wolf, Robert)
Related: [-]
32 32 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/14 2:28 PM
Second Amended Complaint against City and County of Denver, Beth Faragher, Ashley Hinds, Michelle Kline, filed by Gregory Majersky. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Response Mon 04/14 2:22 PM
RESPONSE to25 Response, by Plaintiff Gregory Majersky. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Entry of Default Mon 04/14 2:19 PM
Motion for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Gregory Majersky. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Summary Judgment Mon 04/14 10:25 AM
Plaintiff's Motion for Amended Expedited Summary Judgment Against Defendant Beth Faragher by Plaintiff Gregory Majersky. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Summary Judgment Mon 04/14 10:23 AM
Plaintiff's Motion for Amended Expedited Summary Judgment Against Defendant Ashley Hinds by Plaintiff Gregory Majersky. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Summary Judgment Mon 04/14 10:21 AM
Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Summary Judgment Against Defendant Michelle Kline by Plaintiff Gregory Majersky. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
26 26 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/08 2:12 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants City and County of Denver, Ashley Hinds, Michelle Kline. (Cooper, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
25 25 respm Response to Motion Thu 04/03 2:14 PM
RESPONSE to13 MOTION to Remand,22 MOTION for Summary Judgment,24 MOTION for Default Judgment as to,23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants City and County of Denver, Ashley Hinds, Michelle Kline. (Alers, Andres)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
24 24 motion Default Judgment Tue 04/01 10:30 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default by Plaintiff Gregory Majersky. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Summary Judgment Tue 04/01 10:26 AM
Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Michelle Kline by Plaintiff Gregory Majersky. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Summary Judgment Tue 04/01 10:24 AM
Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Summary Judgment Against Defendant Ashley Hinds by Plaintiff Gregory Majersky. (pklin, ) Modified on 4/1/2025 to update text. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
21 21 motion Dismiss Tue 03/25 4:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Beth Faragher.(Cook, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, March 13, 2025
20 20 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Order on Motion to Stay Thu 03/13 4:55 PM
ORDER by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 03/13/2025. ORDERED that Plaintiff's "Motion to Remand to Denver District Court" (ECF No.13 ) and "Motion to Stay Order to Amend Complaint" (ECF No.14 ) are DENIED. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/11 11:01 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against City and County of Denver, Beth Faragher, Ashley Hinds, Michelle Kline, filed by Gregory Majersky. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
18 18 misc Objections Mon 03/10 4:46 PM
Opposition to Document 1717 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Gregory Majersky. (sadhi, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
17 17 respm Response to Motion Thu 03/06 12:38 PM
RESPONSE to13 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendants City and County of Denver, Ashley Hinds, Michelle Kline. (Alers, Andres)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
16 16 respm Response to Motion Fri 02/21 1:24 PM
RESPONSE to14 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendants City and County of Denver, Ashley Hinds, Michelle Kline. (Alers, Andres)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 02/21 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andres Manuel Alers on behalf of City and County of Denver, Ashley Hinds, Michelle KlineAttorney Andres Manuel Alers added to party City and County of Denver(pty:dft), Attorney Andres Manuel Alers added to party Ashley Hinds(pty:dft), Attorney Andres Manuel Alers added to party Michelle Kline(pty:dft) (Alers, Andres)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
14 14 motion Stay Thu 02/20 11:20 AM
MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff Gregory Majersky. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Confer Attempt
Friday, February 14, 2025
13 13 motion Remand Fri 02/14 9:20 AM
MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Gregory Majersky. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Email Receipt
12 12 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 02/14 9:15 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gregory Majersky. Mr. Majersky will be representing himself in this matter as a pro se litigant. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment to Entry
11 11 6 pgs order Order Fri 02/14 8:56 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 02/14/2025. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order , an amended Complaint on the court-approved Complaint form that complies with the directives contained in this order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended Complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 02/13 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sara Ludke Cook on behalf of Beth FaragherAttorney Sara Ludke Cook added to party Beth Faragher(pty:dft) (Cook, Sara)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Case Assigned to Judge Thu 02/13 11:07 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley. Text Only Entry. (echa, )
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 02/13 11:05 AM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of District Court CV Summons, Complaint upon Beth Faragher on 1/23/2025. (echa, )
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 02/13 11:04 AM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of District Court CV Summons, Complaint upon City and County of Denver - Office of the Mayor on 1/24/2025. (echa, )
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 02/13 11:03 AM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of District Court CV Summons, Complaint upon Michelle Kline on 1/23/2025. (echa, )
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 02/13 11:02 AM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of District Court CV Summons, Complaint upon Ashley Hinds on 1/23/2025. (echa, )
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Thu 02/13 10:59 AM
DISTRICT COURT COMPLAINT against City and County of Denver, Beth Faragher, Ashley Hinds, Michelle Kline, filed by Gregory Majersky.(echa, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Removal: Administrative Notices Thu 02/13 10:58 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (echa, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Thu 02/13 10:58 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (echa, )
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 02/13 10:47 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michelle Kline, Ashley Hinds, City and County of Denver from Denver District Court, Case Number 25cv000017. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10150580), filed by Michelle Kline, Ashley Hinds, City and County of Denver.(Cooper, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex 2 Coversheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex 3 Summons- Hinds,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex 4 Summons-Kline,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex 5 Summons- CCD,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex 6 Summons Faragher,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex 7 Order re: Fees,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex 8 Delay Reduction Order,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex 9 ROS Hinds,
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex 10 ROS Kline,
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex 11 ROS CCD,
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex 12 ROS Faragher,
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex 13 Register of Actions