Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-42682

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Katherine A Constantine
Case #: 4:25-ap-04026
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc.
38 Buttonwood Court
Madison, WI 53718
Plaintiff
Alise M. Evans
5780 Village Trail
Mound, MN 55364
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Butwinick
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
4 4 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Tue 03/11 3:31 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor filed by Alise M. Evans. (Butwinick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/18 2:27 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Alise M. Evans.(Butwinick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Friday, February 14, 2025
2 2 court Summons for adversary proceeding Fri 02/14 4:55 PM
Summons issued on Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc. Date Issued 2/14/2025, Answer Due 3/17/2025 (LMO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/13 10:13 AM
Adversary case 25-04026 (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Alise M. Evans against Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc.. No Fee. (Butwinick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]