Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:25-cv-00173
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 4:35 AM CDT
Defendant
AT&T Inc.
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Comarco Wireless Systems LLC
Represented By
David R Bennett
David R. Bennett
contact info
Steven Kalberg
contact info


Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/24 9:36 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer AT&T Inc. answer due 5/26/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 04/23/2025. (mdj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/22 8:57 AM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by AT&T Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 04, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 04/04 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2025 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
8 8 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 03/06 11:41 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. AT&T Inc. answer is now due 4/25/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(NKL)
Related: [-]
7 7 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 03/06 10:33 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by AT&T Inc.. Summons originally served on 2/18/202225. Agreed new answer date is 4/25/2025.(Dacus, Deron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/05 6:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Comarco Wireless Systems LLC. AT&T Inc. served on 2/18/2025. (Bennett, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 02/13 3:33 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Inc.. (KLC)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 02/13 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David R Bennett on behalf of Comarco Wireless Systems LLC (Bennett, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 02/13 1:17 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Comarco Wireless Systems LLC (Kalberg, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Thu 02/13 1:14 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Kalberg, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 110 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/13 1:12 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against AT&T Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10675539.), filed by Comarco Wireless Systems LLC.(Kalberg, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 United States Patent No. 9,413,187,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 United States Patent No. 10,855,087,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 United States Patent No. 10,951,042,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 02/13 3:22 PM
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne added. (KLC)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Thu 02/13 3:23 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (KLC)
Related: [-]