Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Douglas R Cole
Case #: 1:25-cv-00091
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 7:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Sai Yu Su
107 Quiet Road
Sicklerville, NJ 08003
Plaintiff
Columbus Life Insurance Company
400 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202
Represented By
Christopher B Burch
Bailey Cavalieri LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
11 11 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Mon 05/05 9:12 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Sai Yu Su. (kev)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/20 8:51 AM
Set Deadlines: Sai Yu Su answer due 4/7/2025. (kev)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/19 10:50 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbus Life Insurance Company Notice of Filing Affirmation of Personal Service (Burch, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Javon Cummingsmmins
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/04 4:16 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbus Life Insurance Company Notice of Filing Affirmation of Service (Burch, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affirmation of Service
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/04 2:24 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbus Life Insurance Company Notice of Filing Affirmation of Substitute Service (Burch, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affirmation of Service
Friday, February 28, 2025
7 7 misc Certificate of Clerk Fri 02/28 1:24 PM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk of summons and complaint via certified mail to Defendant Sai Yu Su on 2/28/25. (sem)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/14 10:18 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Columbus Life Insurance Company Civil Cover Sheet (Burch, Christopher)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 02/14 8:33 AM
Summons Issued as to Sai Yu Su. (jmt)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Deficiency (Clerk's Notice) Fri 02/14 8:28 AM
Notice of Deficiency re: Civil Cover Sheet missing. Related Document:1 Complaint filed by Columbus Life Insurance Company. Deficiency Deadline by 3/17/2025. (jmt)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 02/14 8:35 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jmt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/13 5:01 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Burch, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/13 5:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Columbus Life Insurance Company. (Burch, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/13 4:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Sai Yu Su ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10377271), filed by Columbus Life Insurance Company. (Burch, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A