Alabama Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher L Hawkins
Case #: 3:25-bk-80181
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
IGH Properties, LLC, Debtor
5408 Summerville Rd
Phenix City, AL 36867-7480
Represented By
Anthony Brian Bush
The Bush Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Bankruptcy Admin.
Bankruptcy Administrator
U. S. Bankruptcy Administrator One Church Street
Montgomery, AL 36104


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 12:00 PM CDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
42 42 misc Tax Documents/Returns (Restricted Access) Mon 05/05 9:37 AM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2024 filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC. (Bush, Anthony)
Related: [-]
41 41 misc Tax Documents/Returns (Restricted Access) Mon 05/05 9:37 AM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2023 filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC. (Bush, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
40 40 misc Chapter 11 Bank Statements (Restricted Access) Mon 04/21 2:46 PM
Chapter 11 Bank Statements March filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC. (Bush, Anthony)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Chapter 11 Bank Statements (Restricted Access) Mon 04/21 2:45 PM
Chapter 11 Bank Statements March filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC. (Bush, Anthony)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (Small Business) (Official Form 425C) Mon 04/21 2:44 PM
Chapter 11 Small Business Monthly Operating Report March 2025 filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC. (Bush, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit CD Header
Att: 4 Exhibit CD- Exhibit A
Att: 5 Exhibit CD- Exhibit B
Att: 6 Exhibit CD- Exhibit C
Att: 7 Exhibit E
Att: 8 Exhibit F
Att: 9 Exhibit G
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Service Wed 04/09 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Monday, April 07, 2025
36 36 misc Amended Schedules/Statement of Financial Affairs Mon 04/07 2:51 PM
Amended Schedules , Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC Related [+]. (Bush, Anthony)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor IGH Properties, LLC
35 35 order Extend Time Order Mon 04/07 2:20 PM
Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time - Tax Returns due May 5,2025 Related [+] Entered On 4/7/2025.. (RP)
Related: [-] 23
Thursday, April 03, 2025
34 34 utility utility: Remark (public) Thu 04/03 8:36 PM
Status conference held - plan to be filed soon. Related [+]. (BL)
Related: [-] 15 Hearing
33 33 trustee BA Response - Applic to Employ Prof Person Thu 04/03 1:42 PM
Bankruptcy Administrator Response to Application to Employ Professional Person(s) Recommends Employment Related [+] filed by Bankruptcy Admin. Bankruptcy Administrator (Sneed, Hayden)
Related: [-] 7 Application to Employ Professional Person(s) filed by Debtor IGH Properties, LLC
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
32 32 misc Chapter 11 Bank Statements (Restricted Access) Tue 04/01 3:53 PM
Chapter 11 Bank Statements Wells Fargo filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC. (Bush, Anthony)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Chapter 11 Bank Statements (Restricted Access) Tue 04/01 3:53 PM
Chapter 11 Bank Statements Wells Fargo filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC. (Bush, Anthony)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Chapter 11 Bank Statements (Restricted Access) Tue 04/01 3:52 PM
Chapter 11 Bank Statements Wells Fargo filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC. (Bush, Anthony)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Chapter 11 Bank Statements (Restricted Access) Tue 04/01 3:51 PM
Chapter 11 Bank Statements Wells Fargo filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC. (Bush, Anthony)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (Small Business) (Official Form 425C) Tue 04/01 3:50 PM
Chapter 11 Small Business Monthly Operating Report February 2025 filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC. (Bush, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit CD Header (Docket Text of Exhibits C and D)
Att: 4 Exhibit E
Att: 5 Exhibit F
Att: 6 Exhibit G
Saturday, March 22, 2025
27 27 trustee Proceeding Memo - Hearing Held Sat 03/22 12:13 AM
Proceeding Memo - Hearing Held (Non-Image Entry) Related [+] filed by Bankruptcy Admin. Bankruptcy Administrator (Sneed, Hayden)
Related: [-] 12 Meeting of Creditors Ch 11 (Scheduled by BA) filed by Bankruptcy Admin. Bankruptcy Administrator,16 Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Case
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Service - Telephone Hearing Wed 03/19 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - Telephone Hearing - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Hearing
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
25 25 misc Chapter 11 Subchapter V Status Report Tue 03/18 9:27 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Status Report filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC. (Bush, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 15, 2025
24 24 court Set Hearing Sat 03/15 4:02 PM
Notice of Telephone Hearing Set Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/3/2025 at 1:30 PM at Conference Call: (855) 244-8681, Participant Code: 23184477253, Host: Bill Livingston. (BL)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
23 23 motion Extend Time Motion Wed 03/12 11:05 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Income Tax Returns for years of 2023 and 2024 filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC. (Bush, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Service Wed 02/26 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order on Motion to Allow
Monday, February 24, 2025
21 21 order Allow Order Mon 02/24 8:17 AM
Order Granting Debtor's Emergency Motion To Allow Debtor To Maintain And Use Pre-Petition Bank Accounts Related [+] Entered On 2/24/2025. (JS)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, February 20, 2025
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Service Thu 02/20 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Operating Order
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Service Thu 02/20 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 02/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Hearing
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Service - Telephone Hearing Thu 02/20 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - Telephone Hearing - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 02/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Hearing
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Service - Meeting of Creditors Thu 02/20 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - Meeting of Creditors - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 02/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Case
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
16 16 order Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Case Tue 02/18 5:03 PM
Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Case Entered On 2/18/2025. Section 341(a) Meeting of Creditors to be held on 3/20/2025 at 01:00PM at Opelika Video 341 - 7 - https://www.zoomgov.com/j/16196595310. Proofs of Claims due by 4/24/2025. (DWS)
Related: [-]
15 15 court Set Hearing Tue 02/18 3:51 PM
Order Setting Status Conference Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/3/2025 at 01:30 PM at Conference Call: (855) 244-8681, Participant Code: 23184477253, Host: Bill Livingston. (JS)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
14 14 order Operating Order Tue 02/18 3:47 PM
Chapter 11- Subchapter V Operating Order, Entered On 2/18/202 Related [+]. (JS)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor IGH Properties, LLC
13 13 utility utility: Order Due Tue 02/18 2:40 PM
Order to be Submitted by Movant (Non-Image Entry) Related [+]. Order Due by 02/28/2025 (BL)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Allow Filed by Debtor IGH Properties, LLC
12 12 trustee Meeting of Creditors Ch 11 Subchapter V (Scheduled by BA) Tue 02/18 10:15 AM
As authorized by statute, the Bankruptcy Administrator appoints Joseph E. Bulgarella as trustee in this case. Meeting of Creditors Scheduled by BA Section 341(a) Meeting of Creditors to be held on 3/20/2025 at 01:00PM at Opelika Video 341 - 7 - https://www.zoomgov.com/j/16196595310. filed by Bankruptcy Admin. Bankruptcy Administrator (Sneed, Hayden)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
11 11 misc Small Business Statement Concerning 11 U.S.C. 1116(1)(B) Financial Documents Mon 02/17 9:34 AM
Small Business Statement Concerning 11 U.S.C. 1116(1)(B) Financial Documents filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC Related [+]. (Bush, Anthony)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Dismissal Due To Deficiency
Att: 1 Affidavit
Sunday, February 16, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Service - Telephone Hearing Sun 02/16 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - Telephone Hearing - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 02/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Hearing
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Service Sun 02/16 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Dismissal Due To Deficiency
Saturday, February 15, 2025
8 8 court Set Hearing Sat 02/15 3:29 PM
Notice of Telephone Hearing Set Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/3/2025 at 1:30 PM at Conference Call: (855) 244-8681, Participant Code: 23184477253, Host: Bill Livingston. (BL)
Related: [-] 7 Application to Employ Professional Person(s)
Friday, February 14, 2025
7 7 5 pgs motion Employ Professional Person(s) Motion Fri 02/14 4:22 PM
Application to Employ Professional Person(s) Anthony B Bush as Attorney filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC. (Bush, Anthony)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Set Hearing Fri 02/14 1:53 PM
Notice of Telephone Hearing Set Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 2/18/2025 at 2:00 PM at Conference Call: (855) 244-8681, Participant Code: 23184477253, Host: Bill Livingston. (BL)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Allow
5 5 motion Allow Motion Fri 02/14 11:27 AM
Emergency Motion to Allow Use of Prepetition Accounts filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC. (Bush, Anthony)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Clerk's Notice of Deficiency Fri 02/14 10:10 AM
Notice of Dismissal Due To Deficiency for the following: Missing Balance Sheet, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, and Tax Returns Related [+]. Balance Sheet due by 2/21/2025. Cash Flow Statement due by 2/21/2025.Statement of Operations due by 2/21/2025. Tax Returns Due due by 2/21/2025. (JS)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thursday, February 13, 2025
3 3 misc Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement Fri 02/14 10:03 AM
Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC. (JS)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/13 4:17 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-80181 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A15739525, amount $1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 47 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 02/13 4:17 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. filed by Anthony Brian Bush on behalf of IGH Properties, LLC. (Bush, Anthony)
Related: [-]