Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Susie Morgan
Referred: Janis Van Meerveld
Case #: 2:25-cv-00289
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 5:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Nancy Laundry
Represented By
Leslie Pennison Wells
Louisiana Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Liz Murill
Represented By
Leslie Pennison Wells
Louisiana Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Camil Nanni
Represented By
Cameron Robichaux
Seale & Ross, P.L.C.
contact info
Georgia Kobos Thomas
Seale & Ross, Aplc (hammond)
contact info
Defendant
Gerald D Sticker
Represented By
Cameron Robichaux
Seale & Ross, P.L.C.
contact info
Georgia Kobos Thomas
Seale & Ross, Aplc (hammond)
contact info
Plaintiff
Derrick Thomas
39219 Live Oak Dr
Ponchatoula, LA 70454

GPO Apr 17 2025
ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that determination of Landry and Murrill's 12 motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) for insufficient service of process is DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff has until on or before May 17, 2025 to perfect service on Landry and Murrill. If plaintiff does not perfect service on Lanry and Murrill by this date, the motion to dismiss without prejudice will be granted without further notice. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/17/2025. (pp)
GPO Apr 22 2025
ORDER AND REASONS re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Gerald D. Sticker and Camil Nanni's motion to dismiss is GRANTED because the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Gerald D. Sticker and Camil Nanni are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as defendants in this action. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/22/2025.(meb)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
38 38 motion Disqualify Judge Mon 04/28 12:43 PM
MOTION to Disqualify Judge Susie Morgan by Derrick Thomas. (sdp)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Compel Mon 04/28 12:41 PM
MOTION to Compel Clerk and Enforce Default Judgment by Derrick Thomas. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
36 36 motion Disqualify Judge Mon 04/28 11:02 AM
MOTION to Disqualify Judge Susie Morgan by Derrick Thomas.(sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
35 35 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/28 10:52 AM
MOTION to Set Aside Order of Dismissal32 by Derrick Thomas. (sdp)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Compel Mon 04/28 10:43 AM
MOTION to Compel Clerk and Enforce Default Judgment by Derrick Thomas.(sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
33 33 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 04/22 5:02 PM
ORDER AND REASONS re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Gerald D. Sticker and Camil Nanni's motion to dismiss is GRANTED because the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Gerald D. Sticker and Camil Nanni are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as defendants in this action. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/22/2025.(meb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
32 32 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 04/17 4:25 PM
ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that determination of Landry and Murrill's12 motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) for insufficient service of process is DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff has until on or before May 17, 2025 to perfect service on Landry and Murrill. If plaintiff does not perfect service on Lanry and Murrill by this date, the motion to dismiss without prejudice will be granted without further notice. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/17/2025. (pp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
31 31 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/17 3:10 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Derrick Thomas. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
30 30 respm Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/11 10:59 AM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Nancy Laundry, Liz Murill re24 MOTION to Object to Hearsay Statements in Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and to Strike and Object to Hearsay Statements . (Wells, Leslie)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/11 10:40 AM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Nancy Laundry, Liz Murill re23 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . (Wells, Leslie)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Response/Reply Fri 04/11 9:54 AM
Response/Reply by Nancy Laundry, Liz Murill to22 Response/Reply (Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service (R. Doc. 22)) (Wells, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/10 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Non-Response to Insufficient Attorney Filings and Cease and Desist Notice by Derrick Thomas. (bwn)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/10 10:42 AM
NOTICE to the Court by Derrick Thomas. (bwn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/07 2:21 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Camil Nanni, Gerald D Sticker re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim alternativelyMotion to Dismiss under FRCP 56 . (Robichaux, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/04 10:14 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Nancy Laundry, Liz Murill re12 MOTION to Dismiss for insufficient service . (Wells, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
24 24 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/04 2:31 PM
MOTION to Object to Hearsay Statements in Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and to Strike and Object to Hearsay Statements by Derrick Thomas. (sdp)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Disqualify Counsel Fri 04/04 2:27 PM
MOTION to Disqualify Opposing Counsel by Derrick Thomas. (sdp)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Response/Reply Fri 04/04 2:19 PM
Response by Derrick Thomas to12 MOTION to Dismiss for insufficient service ,11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim alternativelyMotion to Dismiss under FRCP 56(sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Friday, March 21, 2025
20 20 service Certificate of Service Fri 03/21 2:51 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Derrick Thomas re19 Request/Statement of Oral Argument,15 MOTION to Object to Hearsay Testimony in Pleadings by Opposing Counsel,17 Request/Statement of Oral Argument,18 Request/Statement of Oral Argument,16 MOTION to Sanction Defendant's Attorney Pursuant to FRCP 11,14 MOTION to Disqualify Defendant's Counsel. (sdp)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Request/Statement of Oral Argument Fri 03/21 2:34 PM
Request of Oral Argument by Derrick Thomas regarding16 MOTION to Sanction Defendant's Attorney Pursuant to FRCP 11 (sdp)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Request/Statement of Oral Argument Fri 03/21 2:31 PM
Request of Oral Argument by Derrick Thomas regarding15 MOTION to Object to Hearsay Testimony in Pleadings by Opposing Counsel (sdp)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Request/Statement of Oral Argument Fri 03/21 2:27 PM
Request of Oral Argument by Derrick Thomas regarding14 MOTION to Disqualify Defendant's Counsel (sdp) Modified on 3/21/2025 (sdp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/21 2:04 PM
MOTION to Sanction Defendant's Attorney Pursuant to FRCP 11 by Derrick Thomas.(sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/21 1:34 PM
MOTION to Object to Hearsay Testimony in Pleadings by Opposing Counsel by Derrick Thomas.(sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/21 1:23 PM
MOTION to Disqualify Defendant's Counsel by Derrick Thomas.(sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit
13 13 misc Response/Reply Fri 03/21 1:12 PM
Response/Reply by Derrick Thomas to12 MOTION to Dismiss for insufficient service ,11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim alternativelyMotion to Dismiss under FRCP 56(sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
12 12 motion Dismiss Wed 03/19 12:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for insufficient service by Nancy Laundry, Liz Murill. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/23/2025.Attorney Leslie Pennison Wells added to party Nancy Laundry(pty:dft), Attorney Leslie Pennison Wells added to party Liz Murill(pty:dft).(Wells, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Notice of Submission
Friday, March 14, 2025
11 11 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6) Fri 03/14 2:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim alternativelyMotion to Dismiss under FRCP 56 by Camil Nanni, Gerald D Sticker. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/9/2025.Attorney Cameron Robichaux added to party Camil Nanni(pty:dft), Attorney Cameron Robichaux added to party Gerald D Sticker(pty:dft).(Robichaux, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts,
Att: 3 Notice of Submission,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/14 8:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Nancy Laundry served on 2/14/2025, answer due 3/7/2025. (sdp)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/14 8:50 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Liz Murill served on 2/14/2025, answer due 3/7/2025. (sdp)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/14 8:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Gerald D Sticker served on 2/14/2025, answer due 3/7/2025. (sdp)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/14 8:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Camil Nanni served on 2/14/2025, answer due 3/7/2025. (sdp)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Wed 02/26 11:12 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Derrick Thomas of summons and complaint served on Gerald Sticker, Camil Nanni, Nancy Laundry, and LIz Murill. (bwn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 02/13 9:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Gerald D Sticker. (cf)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 02/13 9:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Liz Murill. (cf)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 02/13 9:42 AM
Summons Issued as to Nancy Laundry. (cf)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 02/13 9:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Camil Nanni. (cf)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/13 9:34 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Nancy Laundry, Liz Murill, Camil Nanni, Gerald D Sticker (Filing fee $ 405 paid receipt no. 200011075) filed by Derrick Thomas.(cf) edit docket text on 2/13/2025 (cf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet