Evergreen Vintage Aircraft, Inc.
Oregon Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Randall L Dunn |
Case #: | 3:14-bk-36770 |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2014 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 13, 2015 |
Claims Deadline: | Apr 13, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 23, 2016 |
Plan Confirmed: | May 18, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Evergreen Vintage Aircraft, Inc.
1271 NE Highway 99W PMB 502
McMinnville, OR 97128-2720 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee, Portland
620 SW Main St #213
Portland, OR 97205 |
1. | Death of Del Smith triggered Evergreen Vintage bankruptcy filing (oregonlive.com) |
Submitted Mon 01/12/2015 | |
2. | Evergreen Vintage Aircraft bankruptcy filing says it owes IMAX, other creditors (oregonlive.com) |
Submitted Tue 12/16/2014 | |
Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago |
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
262 | 262
![]() Transcript of Evidentiary Hearing Held on May 28, 2016, and Notice of Filing Thereof, re: Court Transcript Review due on 6/10/2019. (pjk) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
261 | 261
misc
Transcript of Hearing Requested
Thu 03/07 3:29 PM
Text Only Entry. Transcript Requested for Hearing Held on 5/28/2016 to be completed by Robyn Anderson. Refer to the court's website (Hearings > Transcript Ordering Information) for transcriptionist contact information. (dje) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
260 | 260
crditcrd
none
Wed 03/06 9:10 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Request for Audio Recording of Court Proceeding([LINK 14-36770 rld11] ) [misc,cdreq] ( 31.00). Receipt Number A17290674. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
259 | 259
misc
Request for Audio Recording of Court Proceeding
Tue 03/05 3:49 PM
Request for Audio of Court Proceeding held on 05/28/2015 at 1:30pm. Recording format: Windows Media Player[Version 7.0 or Higher]. $31 Filing Fee Paid. Filed By Debtor Evergreen Vintage Aircraft, Inc. (HAKER, OREN) |