Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 2:40 AM EST
Defendant
Victor Albino Flores (1)
Represented By
Meaghan O'Connor
Guirguis Law
contact info
Snayha M. Nath
Federal Public Defender - Ednc
contact info
Nardine Mary Guirguis
Guirguis Law, PA
contact info
Defendant
Albino Huerta-Flores (3)
Represented By
Kimberly A. Moore
Federal Public Defender - Ednc
contact info
Defendant
Rosa Maria Meza (2)
Represented By
Hayes S. Ludlum
Ludlum Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Alison Nicole Lester
United States Attorney'S Office - Ednc
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 9:38 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
1 1 5 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT as to Victor Albino Flores (1). (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Seal1 Complaint (Sealed) filed by USA as to Victor Albino Flores. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal as to Victor Albino Flores (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 1/21/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers in case as to Victor Albino Flores. Original to US Marshal's Office for service. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
Arrest of Victor Albino Flores. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Albino Huerta-Flores (1). (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Seal1 Complaint (Sealed) filed by USA as to Albino Huerta-Flores. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal as to Albino Huerta-Flores (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 1/23/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates in case as to Albino Huerta-Flores. Original to US Marshal's Office for service. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
Set Hearing as to Victor Albino Flores: Initial Appearance set for 1/28/2025 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 6th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Rosa Maria Meza (1). (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Seal1 Complaint (Sealed) filed by USA as to Rosa Maria Meza. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal as to Rosa Maria Meza (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 1/27/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers in case as to Rosa Maria Meza. Original to US Marshal's Office for service. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case filed by USA as to Victor Albino Flores. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER granting Oral Motion to Unseal Case as to Victor Albino Flores (1). Entered by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 1/28/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Detention filed by USA as to Victor Albino Flores. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER REGARDING DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT as to Victor Albino Flores. Entered by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 1/28/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
TEXT ORDER as to Victor Albino Flores: As required by Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the court reminds counsel that under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny the suppression by the prosecution of evidence favorable to an accused upon request violates due process where the evidence is material either to guilt or to punishment, irrespective of the good faith or bad faith of the prosecution. 373 U.S. 83, 87 (1963). Failure by the government to comply with its disclosure obligation could result in the exclusion of evidence, an adverse jury instruction, dismissal of charges, reversal of a conviction, vacation of a sentence, and imposition of sanctions against the individuals responsible for the violation, among other consequences. Entered by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 1/28/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to Rosa Maria Meza: Initial Appearance set for 1/29/2025 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 6th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Victor Albino Flores. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
5 5 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum as to Rosa Maria Meza filed by USA as to Rosa Maria Meza. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Victor Albino Flores. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 1/28/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER -Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Rosa Maria Meza for an initial appearance on 1/29/25. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 1/28/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers in Raleigh.Initial Appearance as to Victor Albino Flores held on 1/28/2025. Assistant U.S. Attorney present for government. The government moves to unseal case in its entirety. The court allows the government's motion to unseal. Defendant requests counsel. Federal Public Defender appointed. Defendant advised of rights, charges, and maximum punishments. Government moves for detention. Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 1/31/2025 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 6th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers. The court confirmed to counsel for the government and for defendants both orally and in writing the disclosure obligation of the prosecution under Brady and its progeny and possible consequences of violation of the obligation under applicable law. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (Court Reporter - FTR) (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Victor Albino Flores. Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 1/31/2025 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 6th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 1/28/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
9 9 Notice of Attorney Appearance: Snayha M. Nath appearing for Victor Albino Flores . (Nath, Snayha) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
10 10 Request for discovery filed by Victor Albino Flores . (Nath, Snayha) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
Arrest of Rosa Maria Meza. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case filed by USA as to Rosa Maria Meza. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER granting Oral Motion to Unseal Case as to Rosa Maria Meza (1). Entered by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 1/29/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Detention filed by USA as to Rosa Maria Meza. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER REGARDING DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT as to Rosa Maria Meza. Entered by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 1/29/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs ORDER REGARDING DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT as to Rosa Maria Meza. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 1/29/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
8 8 Notice of Attorney Appearance: Hayes S. Ludlum appearing for Rosa Maria Meza . (Ludlum, Hayes) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
9 9 Request for discovery filed by Rosa Maria Meza . (Ludlum, Hayes) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates in Raleigh.Initial Appearance as to Rosa Maria Meza held on 1/29/2025. Assistant U.S. Attorney present for government. Government moves to unseal case in its entirety. The court allows the government's motion to unseal. Defendant advised the court that she has retained counsel, but counsel was not present at this hearing. Federal Public Defender office agreed to serve as stand in counsel in the event the defendant had any questions. Defendant advised of rights, charges, and maximum punishments. Government moves for detention. Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 2/4/2025 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 5th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers II. The court confirmed to counsel for the government and for defendants both orally and in writing the disclosure obligation of the prosecution under Brady and its progeny and possible consequences of violation of the obligation under applicable law. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (Court Reporter - FTR) (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Rosa Maria Meza. Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 2/4/2025 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 5th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers II. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 1/29/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
16 16 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Returned Executed as to Rosa Maria Meza on 1/29/2025. (Pendergrass, C) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
19 19 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 1/24/2025 as to Victor Albino Flores. (Pendergrass, C) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
Motion Submitted to Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers as to Victor Albino Flores regarding16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of record by Snayha Nath.15 MOTION to Continue Preliminary & Detention Hearings . (Rodriguez, Melissa) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
TEXT ORDER - The preliminary and detention hearings scheduled on Wednesday, 31 January 2025, are hereby continued to Thursday, 6 February 2025 at 10:00 a.m. in the 6th Floor Courtroom at the Terry Sanford Federal Building and Courthouse in Raleigh, North Carolina. Any delay that results from this continuance shall be excluded from the Speedy Trial Act computation pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A) on the grounds that the ends of justice served by granting this continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. Defendant shall remain in custody pending the re-scheduled hearing. Entered by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 1/30/2025. (Rodriguez, Melissa) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
Reset Hearings as to Victor Albino Flores: Preliminary and Detention Hearings reset for 2/6/2025 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 6th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. (Rodriguez, Melissa) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
11 11 Notice of Attorney Appearance: Nardine Mary Guirguis appearing for Victor Albino Flores . (Guirguis, Nardine) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
12 12 Request for discovery filed by Victor Albino Flores . (Guirguis, Nardine) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
12 12 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum as to Rosa Maria Meza for preliminary and detention hearings on 2/4/2025 filed by USA as to Rosa Maria Meza. (Lester, Alison) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
13 13 Notice of Attorney Appearance: Meaghan O'Connor appearing for Victor Albino Flores . (O'Connor, Meaghan) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
13 13 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Rosa Maria Meza for detention hearing on 2/4/2025 om Raleigh. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 1/30/2025. (Grady, B.) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
14 14 Request for discovery filed by Victor Albino Flores . (O'Connor, Meaghan) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
14 14 Pretrial Services Report filed by Toni A. White as to Rosa Maria Meza. (Assenat, C.) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
15 15 MOTION to Continue Preliminary & Detention Hearings filed by Victor Albino Flores. (O'Connor, Meaghan) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
16 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of record by Snayha Nath. filed by Victor Albino Flores. (Nath, Snayha) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
17 17 Pretrial Services Report filed by Jasseli Gutierrez as to Victor Albino Flores. (Foley, A) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER granting16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Snayha M. Nath withdrawn from case as to Victor Albino Flores (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 1/30/2025. (Rodriguez, Melissa) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
Arrest of Albino Huerta-Flores. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
15 15 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 1/28/2025 as to Rosa Maria Meza. (Pendergrass, C) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
ORAL ORDER granting ORAL Motion for Detention Pending Trial as to Rosa Maria Meza (1). Entered by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 2/4/2025. (Pendergrass, C) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
Set Hearing as to Albino Huerta-Flores: Initial Appearance set for 2/5/2025 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 6th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
17 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II in Raleigh - Probable cause and Detention Hearings as to Rosa Maria Meza held on 2/4/2025. Assistant US Attorney present for the Government. Defendant present with counsel. Parties present evidence by oral testimony. Parties make arguments. The Court finds probable cause to support the allegations against the defendant. The Court grants the Government's motion for detention. Defendant is ordered detained and remanded to custody of the US Marshal. (Court Reporter - FTR) (Pendergrass, C) Modified on 2/4/2025 (Pendergrass, C). [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
18 18 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Rosa Maria Meza. Follows oral order of 2/4/2025.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 2/4/2025. (Pendergrass, C) [5:25-mj-01109-BM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
***CHANGE IN HEARING TIME***Reset Hearings as to Victor Albino Flores: Preliminary and Detention Hearings reset for 2/6/2025 at 11:00 AM in Raleigh - 6th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case filed by USA as to Albino Huerta-Flores. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER granting Oral Motion to Unseal Case as to Albino Huerta-Flores (1). Entered by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/5/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Detention filed by USA as to Albino Huerta-Flores. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER REGARDING DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT as to Albino Huerta-Flores. Entered by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/5/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Albino Huerta-Flores. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Albino Huerta-Flores. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/5/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER REGARDING DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT as to Albino Huerta-Flores. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/5/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates in Raleigh.Initial Appearance as to Albino Huerta-Flores held on 2/5/2025. Interpreter (Spanish) sworn. Assistant U.S. Attorney present for government. Defendant requests counsel. Federal Public Defender appointed. Defendant advised of rights, charges, and maximum punishments. Government moves for detention. Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 2/10/2025 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 5th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers II. The court confirmed to counsel for the government and for defendants both orally and in writing the disclosure obligation of the prosecution under Brady and its progeny and possible consequences of violation of the obligation under applicable law. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (Court Reporter - FTR) (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Albino Huerta-Flores. Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 2/10/2025 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 5th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers II. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/5/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
15 15 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 2/3/2025 as to Albino Huerta-Flores. (Foell, S.) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
ORAL ORDER granting Oral Motion for Detention Pending Trial as to Victor Albino Flores (1). Entered by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/6/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
10 10 Notice of Attorney Appearance: Kimberly A. Moore appearing for Albino Huerta-Flores . (Moore, Kimberly) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
11 11 Request for discovery filed by Albino Huerta-Flores . (Moore, Kimberly) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
12 12 Pretrial Services Report filed by Ryen Phillips as to Albino Huerta-Flores. (Farrish, Debra) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
20 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates in Raleigh. Preliminary and Detention Hearings as to Victor Albino Flores held on 2/6/2025. Assistant U.S. Attorney present for government. Defendant present with counsel. Evidence presented by oral testimony. The court finds that probable cause exists to support the charges against the defendant.The governments motion for detention is allowed. The court finds that the government has shown by clear and convincing evidence that there is no condition or set of conditions to reasonably assure the safety of the community if the defendant were to be released before trial. Defendant ordered detained and remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (Court Reporter - FTR) (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
21 21 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Victor Albino Flores. Follows oral order of 2/6/25. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/6/2025. (Horton, B.) [5:25-mj-01084-BM]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
***CHANGE IN HEARING TIME DUE TO INTERPRETER AVAILABLILITY Reset Hearings as to Albino Huerta-Flores: Probable cause and Detention Hearings set for 2/10/2025 at 01:30 PM in Raleigh - 5th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers II. (Pendergrass, C) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
***CHANGE IN HEARING TIME BACK TO 10:00AM*** Reset Hearings as to Albino Huerta-Flores: Probable Cause and Detention Hearings set for 2/10/2025 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 5th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers II. (Pendergrass, C) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
***CHANGE IN COURTROOM LOCATION*** Reset Hearings as to Albino Huerta-Flores: Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 2/10/2025 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers II. (Pendergrass, C) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
Reset Hearings as to Albino Huerta-Flores: Probable Cause and Detention Hearings reset for 2/13/2025 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 6th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. (Pendergrass, C) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
13 13 MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing filed by Albino Huerta-Flores. (Pendergrass, C) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER granting13 Motion to Continue Probable Cause and Detention Hearings as to Albino Huerta-Flores (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 2/10/2025. (Pendergrass, C) [5:25-mj-01094-JG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
22 22 8 pgs INDICTMENT as to Victor Albino Flores (1) counts 1, 2-7, 8, 10, 12, 13, Rosa Maria Meza (2) counts 1, 9, 11, Albino Huerta-Flores (3) counts 1, 8. The foreperson's signature has been redacted pursuant to the E-Government Act. The unredacted version of this document has been filed under seal. (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
23 23 Unredacted Document22 Indictment (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
24 24 Penalty Sheet (Selected Participants Only) as to Victor Albino Flores (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
25 25 Penalty Sheet (Selected Participants Only) as to Rosa Maria Meza (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
26 26 Penalty Sheet (Selected Participants Only) as to Albino Huerta-Flores (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]