Texas Western District Court
Case #: 6:25-cr-00030
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 1:45 AM CST
Defendant
Gregory Earl Gentle, Jr (1)
Represented By
Anthony Smith
Anthony L. Smith Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christopher Michael Blanton
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/14/2025 4:41 AM CST
Monday, February 10, 2025
1 1 3 pgs COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland as to Gregory Earl Gentle, Jr (1). (cav) [6:25-mj-00039-DTG]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Derek T. Gilliland as to Gregory Earl Gentle, Jr. (cav) [6:25-mj-00039-DTG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
3 3 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Gregory Earl Gentle, Jr (1) count(s) 1. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
5 5 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Gregory Earl Gentle, Jr (bot1)
Related: [-]