Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 7:25-cr-00006
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 1:18 AM CST
Defendant
Cory Lynn Byrd (1)
Represented By
Columbus Monroe Solomon, III
Nickols White Solomon
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Laura Montes-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/14/2025 1:58 AM CST
Monday, January 06, 2025
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.) as to Cory Lynn Byrd (1). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd) [7:25-mj-00001-BP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
Arrest of Cory Lynn Byrd (mcrd) [7:25-mj-00001-BP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
3 3 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Columbus Monroe Solomon, III for Cory Lynn Byrd appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 1/8/2025) (mcrd) [7:25-mj-00001-BP]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Cory Lynn Byrd held on 1/8/2025. Date of Arrest: 1/7/2025; Deft executed financial affidavit; O/appointing CJA atty entered;The judge issued the oral order required by Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to follow; o/setting detention and preliminary hearing entered; O/temporary detention pending hearings entered; Deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Eric Chen for Laura Montes; Defense - Monroe Solomon. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO LEe.) (mcrd) [7:25-mj-00001-BP]
Related: [-]
5 5 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Cory Lynn Byrd (mcrd) [7:25-mj-00001-BP]
Related: [-]
6 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Cory Lynn Byrd: This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel are present. By this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligations of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. Failure to do so may result in consequences such as the dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, contempt proceedings, and/or sanctions by the court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 1/8/2025) (mcrd) [7:25-mj-00001-BP]
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION to Continue, MOTION for Pretrial Detention () filed by USA as to Cory Lynn Byrd (mcrd) [7:25-mj-00001-BP]
Related: [-]
8 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Cory Lynn Byrd. Defendant is ordered detained pending a Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 1/14/2025 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 1/8/2025) (mcrd) [7:25-mj-00001-BP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
9 9 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Detention Hearing as to Cory Lynn Byrd held on 1/14/2025, Preliminary Hearing as to Cory Lynn Byrd held on 1/14/2025; Deft waive PC, court finds PC; FBI TFO Beau Jackson, sworn and testified; Court denies gov't motion for detention; o/setting conditions of release entered; Court learned after hearing that deft had an outstanding warrant in Wichita County; o/detention pending trial to follow; Deft reserve right to reopen issue should warrant be resolved; Deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Monroe Solomon. (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:07. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Lee.) (mcrd) [7:25-mj-00001-BP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting Motion for Detention as to Cory Lynn Byrd (1). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 1/28/2025) (mcrd) [7:25-mj-00001-BP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
11 11 INDICTMENT with Forfeiture Notice as to Cory Lynn Byrd (1) count 1. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (jnp)
Related: [-]
13 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER as to Cory Lynn Byrd: Arraignment set for 2/19/2025 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. Attorneys and Defendant to be in the courtroom 15 minutes prior to the start of hearing. Waivers of arraignment are encouraged. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 2/12/2025) (mcrd)
Related: [-]