Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-00073
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 1:17 AM CST
Defendant
Ariannys Beatriz Gutierrez-Carrillo (2)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Houston
contact info
Heather Michelle Hughes
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Endrik Alexander Morales-Rivero (1)
Represented By
Houston Interpreter
contact info
Lindsay Rene Lopez
Law Office Of Lindsay R. Lopez
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 02/14/2025 1:56 AM CST
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
Arrest (Rule 40) of Endrik Alexander Morales-Rivero, filed. (pns4)
Related: [-]
Arrest (Rule 40) of Ariannys Beatriz Gutierrez-Carrillo, filed. (pns4)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
***Set Hearing as to Endrik Alexander Morales-Rivero: Initial Appearance - Rule 40 set for 2/12/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray (pns4)
Related: [-]
***Set Hearing as to Ariannys Beatriz Gutierrez-Carrillo: Initial Appearance - Rule 40 set for 2/12/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray (pns4)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Endrik Alexander Morales-Rivero, filed. (jmm4)
Related: [-]
INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) Minute Entry for proceedings held on 2/12/2025 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray as to Endrik Alexander Morales-Rivero. Defendant first appearance on Indictment from the Tennessee Middle District Court 3:25CR02 and advised of rights/charges. Defendant requests appointed counsel, Financial affidavit executed, Defendant appeared with counsel. Order appointing private counsel will be entered, Defendant waives Identity and Waiver of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings executed, Waiver of Identity executed on the record, Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing to be entered. Detention Hearing set for 2/14/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray Appearances: AUSA Steven Schammel for USA; Lindsay Lopez (CJA) for Defendant.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: Yes) (Pretrial Officer: Yes) Defendant remanded to custody, filed. (jmm4)
Related: [-]
Interpreter needed as to Endrik Alexander Morales-Rivero. Language: SPANISH. Houston Interpreter for Endrik Alexander Morales-Rivero added. (jmm4)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Ariannys Beatriz Gutierrez-Carrillo, filed. (jmm4)
Related: [-]
INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) Minute Entry for proceedings held on 2/12/2025 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray as to Ariannys Beatriz Gutierrez-Carrillo. Defendant first appearance on Indictment from the Tennessee Middle District Court 3:25CR22 and advised of rights/charges. Defendant requests appointed counsel, Financial affidavit executed, Defendant appeared with counsel. Order appointing FPD to be entered, Defendant waives Identity and Waiver of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings executed, Waiver of Identity executed on the record, Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing to be entered. Detention Hearing set for 2/14/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray Appearances: AUSA Steven Schammel for USA; AFPD Amr Ahmed for Defendant.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: Yes) (Pretrial Officer: Yes) Defendant remanded to custody, filed. (jmm4)
Related: [-]
Interpreter needed as to Ariannys Beatriz Gutierrez-Carrillo. Language: SPANISH. Houston Interpreter for Endrik Alexander Morales-Rivero added. (jmm4)
Related: [-]
1 1 Indictment-Middle District of Tennessee Nashville Division as to Endrik Alexander Morales-Rivero, Ariannys Beatriz Gutierrez-Carrillo, filed. (pns4)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant issued 02/05/2025; Returned Executed on 02/11/2025 as to Endrik Alexander Morales-Rivero.. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (pns4)
Related: [-]
3 3 Arrest Warrant issued 02/05/2025; Returned Executed on 02/11/2025 as to Ariannys Beatriz Gutierrez-Carrillo.. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (pns4)
Related: [-]
4 4 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Endrik Alexander Morales-Rivero, filed.
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Endrik Alexander Morales-Rivero. Lindsay Lopez appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmm4)
Related: [-]
6 6 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Endrik Alexander Morales-Rivero Detention Hearing set for 2/14/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmm4)
Related: [-]
7 7 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Ariannys Beatriz Gutierrez-Carrillo, filed.
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Ariannys Beatriz Gutierrez-Carrillo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmm4)
Related: [-]
9 9 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Ariannys Beatriz Gutierrez-Carrillo Detention Hearing set for 2/14/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmm4)
Related: [-]