Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00362
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 1:24 AM CST
Defendant
Javonte Dashaun Williams (1)
Represented By
Minerva Torres
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jayvee G. Rhoda
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/14/2025 2:11 AM CST
Thursday, January 16, 2025
Arrest of Javonte Dashaun Williams (drda) [2:25-mj-00169-MHW]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
Warrant Returned Executed as to Javonte Dashaun Williams. (drda) [2:25-mj-00169-MHW]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Javonte Dashaun Williams. (drda) [2:25-mj-00169-MHW]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Javonte Dashaun Williams. (drda) [2:25-mj-00169-MHW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Javonte Dashaun Williams. (drda) [2:25-mj-00169-MHW]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Javonte Dashaun Williams (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Javonte Dashaun Williams (1).By Judge Joseph A Cordova. (drda) [2:25-mj-00169-MHW]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Initial Appearance as to Javonte Dashaun Williams held on 1/21/2025 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 1/24/2025 9:00AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters, Interpreter NOT required as to Javonte Dashaun Williams (Court Reporter FTR GOLD-MG CIENEGA.) (drda) [2:25-mj-00169-MHW]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Minerva Torres for Javonte Dashaun Williams. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (vg) [2:25-mj-00169-MHW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
5 5 NOTICE Assertion of Rights by Javonte Dashaun Williams (Torres, Minerva) [2:25-mj-00169-MHW]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER as to Javonte Dashaun Williams, Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing RESET for 1/28/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ic) [2:25-mj-00169-MHW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
ORAL MOTION for Bond by Javonte Dashaun Williams and USA as to Javonte Dashaun Williams. (ic) [2:25-mj-00169-MHW]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion for Bond Bond set for Javonte Dashaun Williams (1) $25,000 Secured/$1,500 Surety/2 cosigners-3rd party custodia. as to Javonte Dashaun Williams (1). Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ic) [2:25-mj-00169-MHW]
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing by Javonte Dashaun Williams (ic) [2:25-mj-00169-MHW]
Related: [-]
8 8 Proceedings held before Judge Matthew H. Watters:Detention Hearing as to Javonte Dashaun Williams held on 1/28/2025 (Court Reporter FTR-Gold-C.Levrie.) (ic) [2:25-mj-00169-MHW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
9 9 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Javonte Dashaun Williams (1) count(s) 1, 2. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
11 11 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Javonte Dashaun Williams (bot2)
Related: [-]