California Central District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00131
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 13, 2025 11:31 PM PST
Defendant
George French Jones (1)
Represented By
Howard Shneider
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
US Attorney's Office
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/14/2025 12:19 AM PST
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
1 1 AFFIDAVIT RE: OUT-OF-DISTRICT WARRANT (Rule 5(c)(3)) filed as to defendant George French Jones, originating in the Southern District of Florida. Defendant charged in violation of: 18:3146. Signed by agent T Stovall, USMS, DUSM. USA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
2 2 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant George French Jones; defendants Year of Birth: 1968; date of arrest: 1/10/2025 USMS# REG 24237-112 (mhe)
Related: [-]
3 3 MINUTES OF ARREST ON OUT OF DISTRICT WARRANT held before Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin as to Defendant George French Jones. Attorney: Howard Shneider for George French Jones, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders defendant Permanently detained. Defendant remanded to the custody or currently in the custody of the US Marshal. Defendant remanded to the custody of the US Marshal so he can finish serving his sentence with the BOP Court Smart: CS 1/15/25. (mhe)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant George French Jones (mhe)
Related: [-]
5 5 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant George French Jones. (mhe)
Related: [-]
6 6 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant George French Jones. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (mhe)
Related: [-]
7 7 SEALED Defendant George French Jones arrested on warrant issued by the USDC Southern District of Florida at Miami.(mhe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Charging Documents
8 8 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER REMANDING DEFENDANT TO CUSTODY OF FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS by Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin as to Defendant George French Jones (mhe)
Related: [-]