Iowa Northern District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-01001
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 1:22 AM CST
Defendant
Nicholas David Welter (1)
Represented By
Christopher J Nathan
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Devra Hake
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/14/2025 2:22 AM CST
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
Judge update in case as to Nicholas David Welter: Chief Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (jlh)
Related: [-]
2 2 SEALED Indictment as to Nicholas David Welter (1) count(s) 1. (jlh)
Related: [-]
3 3 REDACTED Indictment as to Nicholas David Welter. (eUSM) (jlh)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Sealing Indictment and Warrant until the arrest of defendant as to Defendant Nicholas David Welter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 1/15/2025. (eUSM) (jlh)
Related: [-]