Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael J Truncale
Case #: 1:25-cv-00076
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2025
Terminated:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 3:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Usher & Lay Company II, LLC
Plaintiff
Lashawnda Spikes
Represented By
Austin Daniel Stelter
Spitz, The Employee'S Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/29 10:24 AM
ORDER acknowledging6 Notice of Dismissal. This action is dismissed with prejudice, and the parties will bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. All court dates and deadlines are vacated, and all pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk is instructed to close this case. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 4/28/25. (tkd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 motion Dismiss Thu 04/24 1:56 PM
MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Lashawnda Spikes. (Stelter, Austin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
5 5 service Summons Reissued Thu 03/27 2:42 PM
SUMMONS REISSUED as to Usher & Lay Company II, LLC and emailed to pltf's attorney for service (tkd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 03/25 4:38 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Usher & Lay Company II, LLC and emailed to pltf's attorney for service (tkd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/10 2:36 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Usher & Lay Company II, LLC, filed by Lashawnda Spikes.(Stelter, Austin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/07 8:44 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Usher & Lay Company II, LLC, filed by Lashawnda Spikes.(Stelter, Austin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/14 8:58 AM
COMPLAINT against Usher & Lay Company II, LLC d/b/a Dairy Queen ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10677011.), filed by Lashawnda Spikes.(Stelter, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/14 10:25 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (tkd)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Fri 02/14 10:26 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lashawnda Spikes. (tkd)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Fri 02/14 10:26 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (tkd)
Related: [-]