Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Richard A Lanzillo
Case #: 1:25-cv-00044
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 5:02 AM EDT
Defendant
WISE CHOICE FOODS, LLC
Plaintiff
PELLEGRINO FOOD PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By
Wallace John Knox, III
Sebald, Hackwelder & Knox
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Wed 02/19 5:07 PM
Disclosure Statement, declaring citizenship by PELLEGRINO FOOD PRODUCTS, INC.. (Knox, Wallace)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Wed 02/19 12:01 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by PELLEGRINO FOOD PRODUCTS, INC. (Knox, Wallace)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Wed 02/19 11:55 AM
Disclosure Statement, declaring citizenship by PELLEGRINO FOOD PRODUCTS, INC. (Knox, Wallace)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Wed 02/19 1:58 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re3 Disclosure Statement. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying citizenship (state) as required pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 2/26/2025. (kss)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
2 2 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Fri 02/14 3:27 PM
Errata re Quality Control message - No signature s/ Complaint by PELLEGRINO FOOD PRODUCTS, INC.. Reason for Correction: Signature. (Knox, Wallace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D
1 1 4 pgs cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Fri 02/14 10:44 AM
COMPLAINT against WISE CHOICE FOODS, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8702916), filed by PELLEGRINO FOOD PRODUCTS, INC. (Knox, Wallace) Modified text on 2/14/2025 to correct party case is filed against. (cel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D
misc QC - No signature s/ Fri 02/14 12:41 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Signature is missing on1 complaint. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit with signature, using Errata event. (cel)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 02/14 12:43 PM
Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo added. (cel)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Fri 02/14 12:46 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying both all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public AND citizenship as required pursuant to both LR 7.1.A and FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 2/21/2025. (cel) Modified text on 2/14/2025. (cel)
Related: [-]