Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:25-cv-00834
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025
Case in other court:Washington Eastern, 2:25-cv-00019
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 7:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Defendant
E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Doe Defendants, John 1-49-
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
AGC Inc
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Defendant
3M Company
Plaintiff
Barbara Thompson
Represented By
Louise R Caro
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Philip F Cossich
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Brett Land
Baron And Budd PC
contact info
Carla Burke Pickrel
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Freeman Thompson
Represented By
Louise R Caro
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Philip F Cossich
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Brett Land
Baron And Budd PC
contact info
Carla Burke Pickrel
Baron & Budd PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
11 11 service Summons Issued Wed 02/19 9:44 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
9 9 misc MDL Member Case Opened Fri 02/14 10:44 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Washington Eastern, 2:25-cv-00019, Thompson et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-834-RMG (rhei, )
Related: [-]
7 7 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 02/14 10:19 AM
Case transferred in from District of Washington Eastern; Case Number 2:25-cv-00019. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
6 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Signed by James V. Ingold, MDL Clerk. (JW, Management Analyst) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 2/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
5 5 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (SG, Case Administrator) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 2/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
3 3 Summons Issued as to Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, E.I. Du Pont de Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC LLC, and Tyco Fire Products LP.(SG, Case Administrator) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 2/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Chemguard Inc,
Att: 2 Chemours Company FC LLC,
Att: 3 Dupont de Nemours Inc,
Att: 4 E.I. Du Pont de Nemours and Co,
Att: 5 The Chemours Company,
Att: 6 Tyco Fire Products LP
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405; Receipt # AWAEDC-4713667) Jury Demand. Filed by Barbara Thompson, Freeman Thompason.(Land, Brett) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 2/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 2/14/2025.]
Related: [-]