Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00999

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:25-ap-00038
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Matthew Sears
9127 County Line Road
Kernersville, NC 27284
Represented By
Matthew Sears
contact info
Plaintiff
James B. Angell, Trustee
P.O. Box 12347
Raleigh, NC 27605
Represented By
A. Scott McKellar
Battle, Winslow, Scott & Wiley, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
7 7 order Compromise Tue 05/06 10:26 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, April 14, 2025
admis Pay Fee-AP Mon 04/14 10:54 AM
Payment of AP Filing Fee in the amount of $350 filed by James B Angell on behalf of James B Angell, Trustee. (Angell, James)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none (ADI) Mon 04/14 10:56 AM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Payment of AP Fee([LINK 25-00038 5-JNC] ) [admis,payfeeap] ( 350.00), Receipt Number A18471597, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
6 6 motion Compromise Tue 04/08 12:02 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise With Matthew Sears filed by A. Scott McKellar on behalf of James B Angell, Trustee. (McKellar, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Mailing Matrix
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/08 10:24 AM
Summons Service Executed on Matthew Sears 3/28/2025. filed by A. Scott McKellar on behalf of James B Angell, Trustee. (McKellar, A.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
4 4 court Summons Reissued Fri 03/21 11:19 AM
Summons Reissued on Matthew Sears Date Issued 3/21/2025, Answer Due 4/21/2025 (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Fri 03/21 11:20 AM
Deadline(s) Terminated. New Summons Reissued. Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no. 3 Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP)
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
3 3 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Tue 03/18 2:44 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to A. Scott McKellar. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: A certificate of service indicating service of the summons and complaint has not been filed. If service was not obtained on the defendant(s) within seven (7) days of issuance of the summons, a new summons will need to be issued. In that event, a new summons should be submitted to the court for reissuance. If service was obtained on the defendant(s), a certificate of service should immediately be filed with the court. Failure to either submit a new summons for reissuance or file a certificate of service of the summons previously issued may result in the matter being scheduled for dismissal pursuant to Local Rule 7055-1. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 3/28/2025. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no.2 Summons Issued on Matthew Sears Answer Due 03/17/2025 (McKellar, A.) filed by James B Angell, Trustee
Thursday, February 13, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 02/13 9:11 PM
Summons Issued on Matthew Sears Answer Due 03/17/2025 (McKellar, A.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/13 9:11 PM
Adversary case 25-00038 5. Complaint by James B. Angell, Trustee against Matthew Sears (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (McKellar, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit