Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Philip P Simon
Referred: John E Martin
Case #: 2:25-cv-00070
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilites Act
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 5:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Community Foundation of Northwest Indiana, Inc.
Represented By
James E Daugherty
Law Offices Of James E Daugherty
contact info
Plaintiff
Janeen L Walker Tarver
Represented By
Lloyd P Mullen
Mullen & Associates PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
13 13 order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 04/22 3:25 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS Rule 26(a)(1) initial exchanges must be completed, but not filed with the Court, by 07/11/2025; Plaintiff's deadline to seek leave to amend the pleadings is 06/20/2025; Defendant's deadline to seek leave to amend the pleadings is 07/25/2025; The deadline to complete all written discovery is 01/09/2026; Plaintiff's expert witness disclosures and reports are to be provided to Defendant by 10/10/2025; Defendant's expert witness disclosures and reports are to be provided to Plaintiff by 11/14/2025; Rule 26(e) supplements are due by 12/12/2025; The deadline to complete all expert discovery is 02/13/2026; The deadline for the parties to select a mediator is 06/20/2025, and mediation must be completed and a report filed by 02/13/2026. The Court VACATES the Preliminary Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for May 8, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 04/22/2025. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Mon 04/21 4:38 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Daugherty, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
11 11 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Tue 04/08 3:38 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/08 3:37 PM
ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2025 11:00 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 5/2/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/8/2025. (smb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/04 10:23 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Community Foundation of Northwest Indiana, Inc..(Daugherty, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A through J
Friday, March 21, 2025
8 8 order Order Fri 03/21 2:54 PM
TEXT ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/21/2025. (smb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 02/27 12:56 PM
Dft Community Foundation of Northwest Indiana, Inc. answer due by 4/9/2025 per6 Agreed Notice. (sej)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/26 4:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Community Foundation of Northwest Indiana, Inc.. (Daugherty, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer Wed 02/26 3:25 PM
AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Community Foundation of Northwest Indiana, Inc. ; answer due by April 9, 2025. (Daugherty, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/26 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James E Daugherty on behalf of Community Foundation of Northwest Indiana, Inc. (Daugherty, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 02/21 7:36 AM
Set Deadlines: Answer due 3/12/2025. (jld)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Wed 02/19 1:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action served on Sherri Holt on behalf of Donald Fesko Registered Agent for Community Foundation of Northwest Indiana, Inc on 02.19.2025, filed by Janeen L Walker Tarver. (Mullen, Lloyd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lloyd P Mullen on behalf of Janeen L Walker Tarver (Mullen, Lloyd)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 02/18 10:33 AM
Summons Issued as to Community Foundation of Northwest Indiana, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/14 1:06 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Community Foundation of Northwest Indiana, Inc. a.k.a Community Care Network, Inc., a.k.a Powers Health a.k.a. Community Healthcare System( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5816754.), filed by Janeen L Walker Tarver.(Mullen, Lloyd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Notice of Appearance,
Att: 3 Complaint
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 02/18 10:31 AM
Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. **NEW CASE** (mrm)
Related: [-]