Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:25-cv-00156
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 5:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Montgomery County Child Support Enforcement Agency
Plaintiff
Lamar D. Jordan
4545 St. Johns Avenue
Dayton, OH 45406


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
5 5 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 04/14 1:59 PM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 300003009 (pb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 03/31 1:30 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE issued in that Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER why the Court should not dismiss this action for failure to prosecute, unless Plaintiff either pays the filing fee or files an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the interim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/31/25. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order Tue 02/18 11:27 AM
ORDER and NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the $405.00 filing fee within THIRTY (30) DAYS. Alternatively, Plaintiff may submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis under § 1915(a) within THIRTY (30) DAYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/18/2025. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 02/18 11:31 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 3/20/2025. (mas)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Deficiency (Clerk's Notice) Fri 02/14 3:57 PM
Notice of Deficiency re: Requires a filing fee or motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Electronic filers can pay the fee[LINK:online] . Please scroll down to the event called, Pay Fees Via Pay.gov to pay the required fee. Related Document:1 Complaint filed by Lamar D. Jordan. (mve)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/14 3:53 PM
COMPLAINT against Montgomery County Child Support Enforcement Agency, filed by Lamar D. Jordan. (mve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope