Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:25-cv-00151
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 5:24 AM EDT
Defendant
C & H Motors, Inc.
Defendant
John Doe 1-10
Plaintiff
Karen A Yates
Columbus, OH 43221
Represented By
Theodore Richard Saker, Jr
Theodore R. Saker, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 05/21 2:56 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Karen A Yates filed by C & H Motors, Inc.. (Peterson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/14 12:25 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Karen A Yates Consents to Join as Named Plaintiffs (Saker, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, April 11, 2025
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/11 2:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to C & H Motors, Inc. on 4/11/2025, answer due 6/10/2025. (Saker, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/09 10:32 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting3 Stipulation, which the Court construes as a Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. C & H Motors, Inc. answer due 5/21/2025. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/9/2025. (agm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
3 3 misc Stipulation Tue 04/08 2:38 PM
STIPULATION Agreed Stipulation of the Parties by Defendants C & H Motors, Inc., John Doe 1-10. (Moore, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 02/14 11:34 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Karen A Yates. (Saker, Theodore) Modified docket text on 2/14/2025 (sem)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/14 11:30 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10378000), filed by Karen A Yates. (Saker, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B