Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-35641

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Alfredo R Perez
Case #: 4:25-ap-03051
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mario Dominic Mazzella, Mario Dominic Mazzella
22910 Lily Creek Dr.
Tomball, TX 77375
Represented By
Mario Dominic Mazzella
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Mazzella, Paul Mazzella, Individually and as Next Friend of D.M., a Minor
Springer & Lyle, LLP 1807 Westminster
Denton, TX 76205
Represented By
Paul Mazzella
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
16 16 order Emergency (Adversary) Fri 05/02 7:31 PM
Order Granting Emergency Agreed Motion to Continue Plaintiff Paul Mazzella's Response to Defendant Mario Mazzella's Motion to Dismiss Related [+], Signed on 5/2/2025. (abh4)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 motion Emergency Motion Fri 05/02 3:49 PM
Agreed Emergency Motion to Continue Plaintiff Paul Mazzella's Response to Defendant Mario Mazzella's Motion to Dismiss [Doc #8] Filed by Paul Mazzella (Dameron, Aubry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss
Monday, April 28, 2025
14 14 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 04/28 1:20 PM
Summons Service Executed on Mario Dominic Mazzella 4/28/2025. (Dameron, Aubry)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 19, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/19 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Setting Hearing
Thursday, April 17, 2025
12 12 order Setting Hearing Thu 04/17 1:37 PM
Order Granting Emergency Agreed Motion to Continue Rule 7016 Conference, Signed on 4/17/2025 Related [+] Scheduling Conference scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (ARP). (tjl4)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference,11 Emergency Motion (Adversary), Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing
11 11 motion Continue Hearing Thu 04/17 12:15 PM
Agreed Emergency Motion to Continue Rule 7016 Conference , Motion to Continue Hearing On Related [+]. Filed by Paul Mazzella (Dameron, Aubry)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
10 10 misc Certificate Tue 04/15 10:48 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Mario Dominic Mazzella ) Related [+] (Wyatt, Donald)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
9 9 misc Certificate Tue 04/15 10:40 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Mario Dominic Mazzella ) Related [+] (Wyatt, Donald)
Related: [-] 7 Generic Application
Monday, April 14, 2025
8 8 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/14 5:30 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Mario Dominic Mazzella (Wyatt, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 motion Generic Application Mon 04/14 5:26 PM
Application Special Appearance Filed by Mario Dominic Mazzella (Wyatt, Donald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
6 6 misc Involuntary Summons Service Executed Tue 03/25 3:47 PM
Summons Service Executed in an Involuntary Case on Mario Dominic Mazzella 3/24/2025, Answer Due 4/14/2025 (Filed By Paul Mazzella ). (Dameron, Aubry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
5 5 court Summons Issued Thu 03/20 3:04 PM
Summons Issued on Mario Dominic Mazzella Date Issued 3/20/2025. (rlm4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
4 4 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Tue 03/18 11:41 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Mario Dominic Mazzella, Donald Wyatt. (Dameron, Aubry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons to Mario Dominic Mazzella
Att: 2 Summons to Defendant's Attorney
Thursday, February 20, 2025
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/20 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
2 2 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Tue 02/18 10:29 AM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/23/2025 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (ARP). (tjl4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Thu 02/13 4:58 PM
Adversary case 25-03051 Nature of Suit: (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) Complaint for a Determination Excepting Debt from Discharge by Paul Mazzella against Mario Dominic Mazzella. Fee Amount $350 (Dameron, Aubry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D
Att: 6 Exhibit E