Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-10663

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:25-ap-01059
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
WestWork Corp. dba WestWork Management
Represented By
WestWork Corp. dba WestWork Management
contact info
Defendant
Workplace Lofts Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By
Workplace Lofts Condominium Association, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey A. Weinman
Represented By
Katharine S. Sender
Allen Vellone Wolf Helfrich & Factor P.C.
contact info
Jordan D. Factor
Allen Vellone Wolf Helfrich & Factor PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
11 11 notice Notice Mon 04/14 10:18 AM
Notice Re: Consent. Filed by Jonah G Hunt on behalf of Workplace Lofts Condominium Association, Inc.. (Hunt, Jonah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/01 10:34 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Jonah G Hunt on behalf of Workplace Lofts Condominium Association, Inc. Related [+]. (Hunt, Jonah)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, March 27, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/27 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
8 8 order Compliance With Rules Tue 03/25 12:56 PM
Order Regarding Compliance With Rules Related [+]. Rules Compliance due by 4/8/2025. (mjb)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint
Thursday, March 20, 2025
7 7 motion Motion Thu 03/20 10:52 AM
Motion to Strike Defendants Answer to the Complaint filed by Defendant Workplace Lofts Condominium Association, Inc. Filed by Katharine S. Sender on behalf of Jeffrey A. Weinman Related [+]. (Sender, Katharine)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Monday, March 10, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/10 11:25 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Workplace Lofts Condominium Association, Inc. Related [+]. (mjb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, February 14, 2025
5 5 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 02/14 2:44 PM
Receipt of Trustee's Payment on Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee([LINK 25-01059 KHT] ) [trustee,trfpdap] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A33413131. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
trustee Trustee's Payment on Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee (Use Adversary Case Number) Fri 02/14 2:42 PM
Trustee's Payment on Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee In the Amount of $350.00 for Adversary Proceeding # 25-1059 (Weinman, Trustee, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Thu 02/13 3:08 PM
Summons Service Executed On: WestWork Corp. and Workplace Lofts Condominium Association, Inc.; 2/13/25 Filed by Katharine S. Sender on behalf of Jeffrey A. Weinman. (Sender, Katharine)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee Thu 02/13 2:26 PM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 02/13 2:26 PM
Summons Issued on WestWork Corp. dba WestWork Management Answer Due 03/17/2025; Workplace Lofts Condominium Association, Inc. Answer Due 03/17/2025. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Sender, Katharine)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/13 2:25 PM
Adversary case 25-01059 Complaint by Jeffrey A. Weinman against WestWork Corp. dba WestWork Management, Workplace Lofts Condominium Association, Inc.. Fee to be Deferred. Adversary Status Deadline 05/14/2025 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Sender, Katharine)
Related: [-]