Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Roy K Altman
Case #: 1:25-cv-20705
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause40:0875 Public Buildings & Property: Negligence
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2025
Terminated:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 4:49 AM EDT
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff
Karina Solorio
Represented By
Meranda M Reifschneider
Meranda Reifschneider, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 05/02 3:02 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case / Closing Case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/2/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Thu 05/01 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Karina Solorio Related [+]
Related: [-] ifschneider, Meranda
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 04/15 2:38 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Proof of Service due by 5/15/2025). Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/15/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
5 5 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Mon 03/03 2:00 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address and email information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney Meranda M Reifschneider (pt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of CHANGE OF ADDRESS, Email or Law Firm Name Tue 02/18 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information; Change of Email; Change of Law Firm Name; by Meranda M Reifschneider Related [+]
Related: [-] ifschneider, Meranda
Friday, February 14, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 02/14 4:58 PM
Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (cwc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 02/14 4:55 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Enjolique A. Lett is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/14 4:43 PM
COMPLAINT KARINA SOLORIO against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18208303, filed by Karina Solorio. Related [+]
Related: [-] ifschneider, Meranda
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet