Oregon District Court
Judge:Michael H Simon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00247
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause22:9003(b) - Petition for Return of Children Under the Hague Convention
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2025
Terminated:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 2:43 AM PDT
Petitioner
Timothy R. Kelly
6617 East Military Road
Cave Creek, AZ 85331
Represented By
Andrew M. Bonderud
The Bonderud Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Katelyn D. Skinner
Buckley Law, P.C.
contact info
Katrina Anne Seipel
Buckley Law, P.C.
contact info
Leonard Williamson
Leonard Warren Williamson P.C.
contact info
Respondent
Christina Ashley Turner
715 SW Bay Street
Newport, OR 97365
Represented By
Michael McCullough
Perkins Coie, LLP
contact info
Marcus A. Torigian
Law Offices Of Marcus A. Torigian
contact info
Sarah J. Crooks
Perkins Coie, LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 25 2025
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law - For the reasons stated herein, the Court DENIES Kelly's Petition for Return. ECF 1. Signed on 4/25/2025 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
51 51 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Thu 05/01 9:15 AM
ORDER - The Court GRANTS Petitioner's Counsels' Motion to Withdraw, ECF49 . Leonard W. Williamson and Andrew M. Bonderud, are hereby removed as attorneys of record for Petitioner, effective immediately. Signed on 5/1/2025 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
50 50 oth_sup Declaration Wed 04/30 4:25 PM
Declaration of Leonard Williamson . Filed by Timothy R. Kelly. Related [+] (Williamson, Leonard)
Related: [-] Motion to Withdraw49 .
49 49 motion Withdraw Wed 04/30 4:23 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel . Filed by Timothy R. Kelly. (Williamson, Leonard)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
48 48 order Judgment - Terminate Case Fri 04/25 4:10 PM
JUDGMENT - This action was heard by the Court in a two-day hearing, from March 27, 2025, to March 28, 2025, with U.S. District Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. The Court issued its Findings of Facts and Conclusions of Law, ECF47 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT: (1) Judgment is entered in favor of Respondent; and (2) The Court DISMISSES the Verified Petition for Return of Child to Habitual Residence, ECF1 . Signed on 4/25/2025 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Related: [-]
47 47 order Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Fri 04/25 3:57 PM
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law - For the reasons stated herein, the Court DENIES Kelly's Petition for Return. ECF1 . Signed on 4/25/2025 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Related: [-]