Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Federico A Moreno
Case #: 1:25-cv-20711
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause22:6082 Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity Act of 1996
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 4:49 AM EDT
Defendant
Expedia Inc.
Represented By
Lauren Ditty
Scott Douglass & Mcconnico LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hotels.com GP, LLC
Represented By
Lorayne Perez
Akerman LLP
contact info
Lauren Ditty
Scott Douglass & Mcconnico LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hotels.com L.P.
Represented By
Lorayne Perez
Akerman LLP
contact info
Lauren Ditty
Scott Douglass & Mcconnico LLP
contact info
Defendant
Orbitz, LLC
Represented By
Lorayne Perez
Akerman LLP
contact info
Lauren Ditty
Scott Douglass & Mcconnico LLP
contact info
Defendant
Expedia Group Inc.
Represented By
Lorayne Perez
Akerman LLP
contact info
Lauren Ditty
Scott Douglass & Mcconnico LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Aureliano A Echevarria
Represented By
Manuel Vazquez
contact info
Andres Rivero
Rivero Mestre LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Echevarria Ochoa
Represented By
Manuel Vazquez
contact info
Andres Rivero
Rivero Mestre LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
16 16 27 pgs cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Fri 05/02 2:17 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against Expedia Group Inc., Expedia Inc., Hotels.com GP, LLC, Hotels.com L.P., Orbitz, LLC, filed by Aureliano A Echevarria, Maria Echevarria Ochoa.(Rivero, Andres)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Monday, April 21, 2025
15 15 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/21 1:37 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Lauren Ditty; granting13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney David D. Shank. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/21/2025. (ms04)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
14 14 motion Dismiss Fri 04/18 7:44 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Plaintiff's Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Expedia Group Inc., Expedia Inc., Hotels.com L.P., Hotels.com GP, LLC, Orbitz, LLC. Responses due by 5/2/2025.(Perez, Lorayne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Mike Marron Decl. ISO MTD,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Cuban Civil Code,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Law of Civil Procedure,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Ley de Aguas 1886_CERT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Tue 04/15 3:33 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David Shank. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18369709 by Expedia Group Inc., Expedia Inc., Hotels.com L.P., Hotels.com GP, LLC, Orbitz, LLC. Attorney Lorayne Perez added to party Expedia Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/29/2025.(Perez, Lorayne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Tue 03/11 8:43 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Lauren Ditty. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18274737 by Expedia Group Inc., Hotels.com L.P., Hotels.com GP, LLC, Orbitz, LLC. Responses due by 3/25/2025.(Perez, Lorayne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, March 10, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 03/10 6:19 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lorayne Perez on behalf of Expedia Group Inc., Hotels.com L.P., Hotels.com GP, LLC, Orbitz, LLC. Attorney Lorayne Perez added to party Expedia Group Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lorayne Perez added to party Hotels.com L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Lorayne Perez added to party Hotels.com GP, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lorayne Perez added to party Orbitz, LLC(pty:dft). (Perez, Lorayne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order Reassigning/Transferring Case Wed 02/26 11:45 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Federico A. Moreno for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 2/25/2025. Judge Rodney Smith no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 2/25/2025. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/19 12:04 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES AND MOTION TO TRANSFER by Aureliano A Echevarria, Maria Echevarria Ochoa (Rivero, Andres)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
8 8 8 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 02/19 10:39 AM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements. Joint Scheduling Report due by 4/30/2025. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 2/18/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/18 2:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aureliano A Echevarria, Maria Echevarria Ochoa. Orbitz, LLC waiver sent on 2/18/2025, response/answer due 4/21/2025. (Rivero, Andres)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/18 2:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aureliano A Echevarria, Maria Echevarria Ochoa. Hotels.com L.P. waiver sent on 2/18/2025, response/answer due 4/21/2025. (Rivero, Andres)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/18 2:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aureliano A Echevarria, Maria Echevarria Ochoa. Hotels.com GP, LLC waiver sent on 2/18/2025, response/answer due 4/21/2025. (Rivero, Andres)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/18 2:10 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aureliano A Echevarria, Maria Echevarria Ochoa. Expedia Inc. waiver sent on 2/18/2025, response/answer due 4/21/2025. (Rivero, Andres)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/18 2:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aureliano A Echevarria, Maria Echevarria Ochoa. EXPEDIA GROUP INC waiver sent on 2/18/2025, response/answer due 4/21/2025. (Rivero, Andres)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 02/18 8:24 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/14 6:02 PM
COMPLAINT For Damages against EXPEDIA GROUP INC, Expedia Inc., Hotels.com GP, LLC, Hotels.com L.P., Orbitz, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18208739, filed by Aureliano A Echevarria, Maria Echevarria Ochoa.(Rivero, Andres)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I