Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Craig S Denney
Case #: 3:25-cv-00090
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 2:42 AM PDT
Defendant
Lobbyist Registrar
Represented By
Kevin C. Powers
Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau, Legal Division
contact info
Defendant
Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Represented By
Kevin C. Powers
Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau, Legal Division
contact info
Defendant
Kevin C. Powers
Represented By
Kevin C. Powers
Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau, Legal Division
contact info
Defendant
State of Nevada
Represented By
Kevin C. Powers
Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau, Legal Division
contact info
Plaintiff
Drew J. Ribar
3480 Pershing Ln.
Washoe Valley, NV 89704


Docket last updated: 24 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
25 25 respm Response Tue 05/06 11:46 PM
RESPONSE to22 Motion for Leave to File Document/Excess Pages, by Defendants State of Nevada, Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau, Kevin C. Powers, Lobbyist Registrar. Replies due by 5/13/2025. (Powers, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
24 24 order Standing Order Mon 04/28 3:04 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER of U.S. Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
23 23 motion Stipulation Tue 04/22 4:31 PM
PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Drew J. Ribar. (GA) (other) (pleading)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Motion Leave to File Document/Excess Pages Tue 04/22 4:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Drew J. Ribar. Responses due by 5/6/2025.(GA) (pleading) (GA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit List,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G
Att: 9 (4/22/2025) Cover Sheet
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Wed 04/09 11:55 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Extend Time. Responses due by 4/22/2025. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 4/9/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
20 20 respm Non-Opposition to Motion Mon 04/07 5:47 PM
NON-OPPOSITION to19 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Defendants State of Nevada, Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau, Kevin C. Powers, Lobbyist Registrar. (Powers, Kevin)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Mon 04/07 11:23 AM
Expedited Request MOTION to Extend Time to File Opposition to16 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Drew J. Ribar. Responses due by 4/21/2025. (DRM) (sumjgm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
18 18 order Minute Order Klingele Tue 03/25 7:19 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 3/25/2025. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to16 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
17 17 respm Response Fri 03/21 11:44 PM
RESPONSE to4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants State of Nevada, Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau, Kevin C. Powers, Lobbyist Registrar. Replies due by 3/28/2025. (Powers, Kevin)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Motion Dismiss Fri 03/21 11:42 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint, by Defendants State of Nevada, Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau, Kevin C. Powers, Lobbyist Registrar. Responses due by 4/4/2025. (Powers, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Mon 03/10 10:50 AM
ORDER - It is ordered that that Defendants' motion for an extension of time (ECF No.10 ) and Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time (ECF No.8 ) are both granted. Defendants have until March 21, 2025, to file their responsive documents to both Plaintiffs complaint and motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 3/10/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice Attorney Action Required Mon 03/10 9:37 AM
NOTICE: Action Required to12 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,8 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,9 Declaration,11 Response,13 Certificate of Service. Drew J. Ribar advised to review and comply with LR IA 10-2 on all future filings with this Court. No further action required regarding8 9 11 12 13 . (no image attached) (WJ)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Certificate of Service Mon 03/10 8:46 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for11 Response,12 Motion, by Plaintiff Drew J. Ribar. (DRM)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Mon 03/10 8:41 AM
MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiff Drew J. Ribar. Responses due by 3/24/2025.(DRM) (presiding)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 respm Response Mon 03/10 8:35 AM
RESPONSE to10 Motion to Extend Time, by Plaintiff Drew J. Ribar. Replies due by 3/17/2025. (DRM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
10 10 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Fri 03/07 9:30 AM
First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re1 Complaint,4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,8 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Defendants State of Nevada, Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau, Kevin C. Powers, Lobbyist Registrar. Responses due by 3/21/2025. (Powers, Kevin) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
9 9 misc Declaration Fri 03/07 8:32 AM
DECLARATION of Non-Service by Drew J. Ribar (DRM)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Fri 03/07 8:24 AM
MOTION to Extend Time re responses to1 Complaint,4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiff Drew J. Ribar. Responses due by 3/20/2025. (DRM) (answer)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Certificate of Service Fri 03/07 8:21 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE, by Plaintiff Drew J. Ribar. (DRM)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice Other Fri 03/07 8:18 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proof of Service, by Drew J. Ribar. (DRM)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
5 5 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Tue 02/18 11:05 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (GA)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 02/18 11:03 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Drew J. Ribar. Responses due by 2/28/2025. (GA)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 02/18 11:01 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (GA)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 02/18 10:59 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Drew J. Ribar. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (GA)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/18 10:53 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 paid Receipt 3-0820 ) by Drew J. Ribar. (GA) (GA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Receipt,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
Att: 3 (2/18/2025) Notice to Litigants
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 02/14 3:44 PM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (GA)
Related: [-]