New York Southern District Court
Judge:Philip M Halpern
Case #: 7:25-cv-01356
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 4:53 AM EDT
Defendant
HLHC, LLC
1 Gateway Center Suite 2600
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Marc Joseph Gansah
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Matthew Paul Gizzo
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Aaron Warshaw
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Defendant
Home Life Health Care, LLC
231 West 29th Street Ste 400
New York, NY 10001
Represented By
Marc Joseph Gansah
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Matthew Paul Gizzo
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Aaron Warshaw
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Defendant
Laurie Racanelli
108 E. Sunnyside Lane
Irvington, NY 10533
Represented By
Marc Joseph Gansah
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Matthew Paul Gizzo
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Aaron Warshaw
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Plaintiff
Elder Care Homecare Inc.
111 Brook Street Ste 205
Scarsdale, NY 10583
Represented By
Lori A Medley
Epstein Becker & Green
contact info
Brittany J. Finder
Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.
contact info
Eric William Moran
Epstein Becker & Green
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/21 11:03 AM
ORDER granting25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Application granted. Defendants shall answer or move with respect to the Complaint by May 6, 2025. SO ORDERED. HLHC, LLC answer due 5/6/2025; Home Life Health Care, LLC answer due 5/6/2025; Laurie Racanelli answer due 5/6/2025. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/18/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/18 10:51 AM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Marc-Joseph Gansah dated April 18, 2025. Document filed by HLHC, LLC, Home Life Health Care, LLC, Laurie Racanelli..(Gansah, Marc Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/17 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Russell Edwards on behalf of Elder Care Homecare Inc...(Edwards, Russell)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/17 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Richard Green on behalf of Elder Care Homecare Inc...(Green, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Substitution of Attorney Fri 04/11 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Eric Moran (Greenberg Traurig), Brittany Finder Lori Medley (Epstein Becker Green), New Attorney: Scott R. Green (Goldberg Segalla), Address: Goldberg Segalla LLP - Garden City, NY, 200 Garden City Plz Ste 520, Garden City, New York, United States 11530-3203, 5162819859. Document filed by Elder Care Homecare Inc...(Green, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/27 3:31 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron Warshaw on behalf of Laurie Racanelli, Home Life Health Care, LLC, HLHC, LLC..(Warshaw, Aaron)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/27 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Paul Gizzo on behalf of Laurie Racanelli, Home Life Health Care, LLC, HLHC, LLC..(Gizzo, Matthew)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/27 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Joseph Gansah on behalf of Laurie Racanelli, Home Life Health Care, LLC, HLHC, LLC..(Gansah, Marc Joseph)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/27 3:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Home Life Health Care, LLC waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025. Document filed by Elder Care Homecare Inc...(Moran, Eric)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/27 3:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Laurie Racanelli waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025. Document filed by Elder Care Homecare Inc...(Moran, Eric)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/27 3:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. HLHC, LLC waiver sent on 2/19/2025, answer due 4/21/2025. Document filed by Elder Care Homecare Inc...(Moran, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
15 15 service Summons Issued Wed 02/19 12:32 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Laurie Racanelli. (vf)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Wed 02/19 12:31 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HLHC, LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Wed 02/19 12:31 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Home Life Health Care, LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
12 12 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/18 2:54 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Laurie Racanelli, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elder Care Homecare Inc...(Moran, Eric)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/18 2:52 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HLHC, LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elder Care Homecare Inc...(Moran, Eric)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/18 2:49 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Home Life Health Care, LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elder Care Homecare Inc...(Moran, Eric)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 02/18 10:36 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Eric William Moran. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to Westchester. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 02/18 10:39 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 02/18 10:40 AM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 02/18 10:40 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/18 10:45 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Eric William Moran to RE-FILE Document No. 7 Request for Issuance of Summons, 8 Request for Issuance of Summons, 6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the Clerk Signature field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
9 9 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/14 8:37 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Elder Care Homecare Inc...(Moran, Eric)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/14 8:34 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HLHC, LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elder Care Homecare Inc...(Moran, Eric)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/14 8:31 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Home Life Health Care, LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elder Care Homecare Inc...(Moran, Eric)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/14 8:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Laurie Racanelli, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Elder Care Homecare Inc...(Moran, Eric)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/14 8:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Moran, Eric)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/14 8:10 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brittany J. Finder on behalf of Elder Care Homecare Inc...(Finder, Brittany)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/14 8:07 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lori A Medley on behalf of Elder Care Homecare Inc...(Medley, Lori)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/14 8:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric William Moran on behalf of Elder Care Homecare Inc...(Moran, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 37 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/14 7:57 PM
COMPLAINT against HLHC, LLC, Home Life Health Care, LLC, Laurie Racanelli. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30626108)Document filed by Elder Care Homecare Inc...(Moran, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Security and Confidentiality Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Employee-Client Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Policy and Procedure Manual